This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2018 at 08:00:30 (UTC).

DeCapua v. Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 DeCapua filed an Other lawsuit against Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00590

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David DeCapua

Defendant

Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Hutchinson

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Evan J Ballan

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Peter N. Wasylyk

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter N. Wasylyk

1307 Chalkstone Avenue

Providence, RI 02908

Defendant Attorneys

Dana M. Horton

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

One Financial Plaza, Suite 1430, 709-3300, Fax: 709-3399

Providence, RI 02903

Archis A. Parasharami

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Horton, Dana) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION filed by David DeCapua. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Evan J. Ballan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1291796 ) filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Daniel M. Hutchinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1291780 ) filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Archis A. Parasharami to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1290960 ) filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#6

(#6) First STIPULATION filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana M. Horton on behalf of Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Horton, Dana) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Request filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1279416 ), filed by David DeCapua. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Horton, Dana) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION filed by David DeCapua. (Hutchinson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan J Ballan. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/28/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Hutchinson. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/28/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Evan J. Ballan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1291796 ) filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Daniel M. Hutchinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1291780 ) filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Archis A. Parasharami. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/26/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Archis A. Parasharami to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1290960 ) filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First STIPULATION filed by Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Horton, Dana) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana M. Horton on behalf of Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Horton, Dana) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Request filed by David DeCapua. (Wasylyk, Peter) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1279416 ), filed by David DeCapua. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel M. Hutchinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter N. Wasylyk