This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2018 at 07:28:44 (UTC).

De La Rosa v. Secretary of Health and Human Services

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 De La Rosa filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Secretary of Health and Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02644

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria de la Rosa

Defendants

Secretary of Health and Human Services

Secretary Of The Treasury

Continental Services Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John W. Escover

Attorney at The Law Offices of John W. Escover, LLLP

4500 Williams Dr., Suite 212-198

Georgetown, TX 78633

John William Escover

Attorney at The Law Offices of John W. Escover, LLLP

4500 Williams Dr, Suite 212-198

Georgetown, TX 78633

Defendant Attorneys

Ralph Elwood Girvin, Jr.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

700 E. San Antonio, Suite 200

El Paso, TX 79901

Ariel Nicole Wiley

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1000 Louisiana Street, #2300

Houston, TX 77002

Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither

Attorney at Assistant US Atty

Po Box 61129

Houston, TX 77208

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9922259), filed by Maria De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Escover, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/28/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

summons

#2

(#3) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to John Escover re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. Summons not issued to "Conserve". (afd) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

2 #1

summons

2 #4

summons

2 #3

summons

#3

(#3) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to John Escover re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. Summons not issued to "Conserve". (afd) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Secretary of Health and Human Services, Secretary of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (afd) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel N Wiley on behalf of Continental Services Group, Inc., Secretary Of The Treasury, Secretary of Health and Human Services, filed. (Wiley, Ariel) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#35

(#35) Management ORDER. De La Rosa abandons all claims that do not derive from the Social Security Act. By 10/8/2018, the Secretary of Health and Human Services must give all of De La Rosa's records to her. By 10/29/2018, the parties will file a joint status report. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#34

(#34) CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: John Escover, Eleanor Robinson-Gaither, Ariel Wiley. Ct Reporter: G. Dye. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 11/5/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Robinson Gaither on behalf of Secretary of Health and Human Services, filed. (Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#31

(#31) MOTION for John W Escover to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maria de la Rosa, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2018. (scastillo, 1) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #31 Motion for John W. Escover to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#30

(#30) Order: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#29

(#29) Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:17-cv-00833; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 08/01/2018)

29 #1

*Restricted*

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel N Wiley on behalf of Continental Services Group, Inc., Secretary Of The Treasury, Secretary of Health and Human Services, filed. (Wiley, Ariel) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Management ORDER. De La Rosa abandons all claims that do not derive from the Social Security Act. By 10/8/2018, the Secretary of Health and Human Services must give all of De La Rosa's records to her. By 10/29/2018, the parties will file a joint status report. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: John Escover, Eleanor Robinson-Gaither, Ariel Wiley. Ct Reporter: G. Dye. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 11/5/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Robinson Gaither on behalf of Secretary of Health and Human Services, filed. (Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER granting #31 Motion for John W. Escover to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION for John W Escover to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maria de la Rosa, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2018. (scastillo, 1) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Order: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:17-cv-00833; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER APPROVING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-styled cause of action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Secretary of Health and Human Services. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Maria De La Rosa (Escover, John) (Entered: 10/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE RE Service by Maria De La Rosa (Escover, John) (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from the Assistant United States Attorney regarding method of service. (jf) (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Continental Services Group, Inc..(ml) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maria De La Rosa. (Escover, John) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Secretary of Health and Human Services, Secretary of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (afd) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to John Escover re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. Summons not issued to "Conserve". (afd) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maria De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons)(Escover, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9922259), filed by Maria De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Escover, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.