This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:58:34 (UTC).

Dazzle Up, LLC v. Mouseprint Media, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 Dazzle Up, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Mouseprint Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and John Antoon II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01745

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

John Antoon II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dazzle Up, LLC

Defendants

Mouseprint Media, LLC

Eric A. Wichhart

Mouseprint Media, LLC doing business as DisGear

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek J. Angell

Attorney at O'Connor & O'Connor, LLC

800 N. Magnolia Ave., Suite 1350

Orlando, FL 32803

Dennis R. O'Connor

Attorney at O'Connor & O'Connor, LLC

800 N. Magnolia Ave., Suite 1350

Orlando, FL 32803

David W. Sar

Attorney at Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey & Leonard, LLP

230 N Elm St - Ste 2000, Po Box 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420

Clint S. Morse

Attorney at Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey & Leonard, LLP

230 N Elm St - Ste 2000, Po Box 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Eric A. Wichhart (JET) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#16

(#16) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mouseprint Media, LLC (JET) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#15

(#15) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Mouseprint Media, LLC, Eric A. Wichhart by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/30/2018. (RN) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#13

(#13) MOTION for David W. Sar to appear pro hac vice by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Clint S. Morse to appear pro hac vice by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#11

(#11) RETURN of service executed on October 22, 2018 by Dazzle Up, LLC as to Eric A. Wichhart. (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#10

(#10) RETURN of service executed on October 22, 2018 by Dazzle Up, LLC as to Mouseprint Media, LLC. (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dazzle Up, LLC. Related case(s): no (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

7 #1

Complaint

#7

(#7) Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JET) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

6 #1

Complaint

#6

(#6) Copyright Report sent (mailed) to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JET) Modified on 10/17/2018 (JET). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/17/2018. (counsel emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/17/2018. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Mouseprint Media, LLC, Eric A. Wichhart. Mailed to attorney for service. (JET) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to counsel Clint S. Morse of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). See signature block on Complaint. (JET) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Eric A. Wichhart (JET) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mouseprint Media, LLC (JET) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Mouseprint Media, LLC, Eric A. Wichhart by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Clint S. Morse, appearing on behalf of Dazzle Up, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL078178.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Clint S. Morse to appear pro hac vice. (JET) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney David W. Sar, appearing on behalf of Dazzle Up, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL078177.) Related document: #13 MOTION for David W. Sar to appear pro hac vice. (JET) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/30/2018. (RN) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for David W. Sar to appear pro hac vice by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Clint S. Morse to appear pro hac vice by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN of service executed on October 22, 2018 by Dazzle Up, LLC as to Eric A. Wichhart. (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN of service executed on October 22, 2018 by Dazzle Up, LLC as to Mouseprint Media, LLC. (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dazzle Up, LLC. Related case(s): no (Angell, Derek) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JET) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Copyright Report sent (mailed) to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JET) Modified on 10/17/2018 (JET). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/17/2018. (counsel emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/17/2018. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to Mouseprint Media, LLC, Eric A. Wichhart. Mailed to attorney for service. (JET) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to counsel Clint S. Morse of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). See signature block on Complaint. (JET) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mouseprint Media, LLC, Eric A. Wichhart with Jury Demand, Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL077718, filed by Dazzle Up, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JET) Modified on 10/17/2018 (JET). (This Complaint includes both Trademark and Copyright infringement claims.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dazzle Up, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clint S. Morse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek J. Angell