This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:55:34 (UTC).

Dayton v. Lisenbee et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Dayton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lisenbee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia L. Cohen and Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01670

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Patricia L. Cohen

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas E. Dayton

Rolla, MO 65401

Defendants

Richard Lisenbee

Matt Shults

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Document construed as, "MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner)" by Plaintiff Douglas E. Dayton. (DLB) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #2

Judge Assignment Label

#4

(#4) Letter to Clerk of Court from Plaintiff Re: Filing of Complaint. (EAB) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#5

(#5) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (MCB) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#1

(#1) Document construed as, "PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983" against defendant Richard Lisenbee, Matt Shults, filed by Douglas E. Dayton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. sent to non-electronic party this date Wed Oct 17 15:23:17 CDT 2018 (Berg, Melanie) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (MCB) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter to Clerk of Court from Plaintiff Re: Filing of Complaint. (EAB) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • (#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Oct 3 11:01:06 CDT 2018 (admin,) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (DLB) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Document construed as, "MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner)" by Plaintiff Douglas E. Dayton. (DLB) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Document construed as, "PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983" against defendant Richard Lisenbee, Matt Shults, filed by Douglas E. Dayton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.