This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2018 at 07:19:44 (UTC).

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC. v. FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and John Michael Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-14105

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 - 10

FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID D. LIN

Attorney at LEWIS & LIN LLC

45 Main Street, Suite 608

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

ROLANDO A. DIAZ

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

1000 N West St #1203

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

18 #1

Exhibit A - Copyright Assignments

9 #6

Certificate of Service

9 #5

Text of Proposed Order

9 #4

Exhibit C

9 #3

Exhibit B

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#9

Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey M. Dureska, #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Ludwig. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

5 #4

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Certification of Scott Alan Burroughs

5 #1

Certification and Application of David D. Lin in Support of Motion

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (byl) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC. identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1 - 10, FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9038914) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice fee as to Scott Alan Burroughs: $ 150, receipt number NEW037948 (sm) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Assignments)(LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Geoffrey M. Dureska to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9145393.) (DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Ludwig to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9145341.) (DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey M. Dureska, #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Ludwig. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Granting Defendants #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission as to Geoffrey M. Dureska; shall may annual payments to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; shall pay the sum of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 10/23/2018. (sm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Granting Defendants #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission as to David Ludwig; shall may annual payments to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; shall pay the sum of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 10/23/2018. (sm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey M. Dureska by FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Geoffrey M. Dureska, #2 Certification of Rolando Diaz, #3 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ROLANDO A. DIAZ on behalf of FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. (DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Admission Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott Alan Burroughs; shall pay the annual fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 10/16/2018. (sm) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/16/2018) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott Alan Burroughs. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott Alan Burroughs by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification and Application of David D. Lin in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of Scott Alan Burroughs, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (byl) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC. identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1 - 10, FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9038914) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FH Group International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROLANDO A. DIAZ