This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2019 at 00:48:13 (UTC).

Day to Day Imports Inc v. FH Group International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2016 Day to Day Imports Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against FH Group International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-04625

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Day to Day Imports Inc

Defendants

FH Group International, Inc.

FH Group International, Inc

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aryeh L Kaufman

Attorney at Law Office of Aryeh Kaufman

5482 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1907

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Tan

Attorney at Russakow Greene and Tan LLP

790 E Green Street

Pasadena, CA 91101

Mark L Russakow

Attorney at Russakow and Tan LLP

790 East Green Street

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Civil Minutes of 1/3/2017

#20

(#20) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed copies to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Civil Minutes of 1/3/2017) (gk) (Entered: 01/04/2017)

#19

(#19) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendant FH Group International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #11 is GRANTED, without prejudice. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 01/04/2017)

#17

(#17) REPLY First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #11 filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. (Russakow, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2016)

16 #1

Declaration In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss

#16

(#16) OPPOSITION opposition re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #11 filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 09/27/2016)

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Declaration

#11

(#11) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Tan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc, identifying Day To Day Imports, Inc.. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/27/2016)

1 #3

Exhibit B. Accused Design Sold on Amazon.com

1 #2

Exhibit A. Copyright Registration and Deposit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet CV-71 Final

#1

(#14) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Day to Day Imports Inc amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registrations)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 09/09/2016)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed copies to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Civil Minutes of 1/3/2017) (gk) (Entered: 01/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendant FH Group International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #11 is GRANTED, without prejudice. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 01/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • (#18) NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dolly M Gee. Effective October 31, 2016, Judge Gee will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 8C on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/25/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #11 filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. (Russakow, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) OPPOSITION opposition re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #11 filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 09/27/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE FH GROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/22/2016, Defendant FH Group International, Inc. ("FH") Group filed a Motion to Dismiss ("MTD") for lack of personal jurisdiction or improper venue and, alternatively, moved to transfer the action to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey #11 . On 9/9/2016, when its opposition papers were due, Plaintiff Day to Day Imports, Inc. ("Day to Day") filed a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") #14 as a matter of course under Rule 15(a). The Court deems FH Group's MTD to be interposed against the FAC and invites Day to Day to respond to the MTD and address why this case should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. Day to Day shall file its response by 9/27/2016. FH Group shall file its reply by 10/4/2016. Thereafter, the MTD will be taken under submission and a written order will issue. The 9/30/2016 hearing is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Day to Day Imports Inc amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registrations)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 09/09/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Day to Day Imports Inc. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 09/09/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties identifying Huyan Fang and Jinli Hao. (Tan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Tan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/22/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to FH Group International, Inc. answer now due 8/22/2016, filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc..(Attorney Mark L Russakow added to party FH Group International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Russakow, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 07/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/30/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc, identifying Day To Day Imports, Inc.. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car) (Entered: 06/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/27/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18087514 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Day to Day Imports Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CV-71 Final, #2 Exhibit A. Copyright Registration and Deposit, #3 Exhibit B. Accused Design Sold on Amazon.com) (Attorney Aryeh L Kaufman added to party Day to Day Imports Inc(pty:pla))(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/27/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FH Group International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aryeh L Kaufman