This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2018 at 09:16:17 (UTC).

Day To Day Imports, Inc v. FH Group International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 Day To Day Imports, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against FH Group International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-08291

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.

Day To Day Imports, Inc

Defendants

FH Group International, Inc.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aryeh L Kaufman

Attorney at Law Office of Aryeh Kaufman

5482 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1907

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Tan

Attorney at Russakow and Tan LLP

790 East Green Street

Pasadena, CA 91101

Geoffrey M Dureska

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett and Ludwig PLLC

1870 The Exchange Se Suite 100

Atlanta, GA 30339

David Ludwig

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett and Ludwig PLLC

211 Church Street Se

Leesburg, VA 20175

 

Court Documents

26 #8

Exhibit #6 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq.

#26

(#26) OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by Plaintiff Day To Day Imports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Akiva Nourollah in support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq. in support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #3 Exhibit #1 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #4 Exhibit #2 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #5 Exhibit #3 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #6 Exhibit #4 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #7 Exhibit #5 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #8 Exhibit #6 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq.)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

13 #7

Notice of Interested Parties

13 #6

Proposed Order

13 #4

Declaration

13 #3

Exhibit B

13 #2

Exhibit A

13 #1

Notice of Motion

#13

(#21) [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER #22 ] Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from February 2, 2018 to February 9, 2018 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by plaintiff Day To Day Imports, Inc.(Kaufman, Aryeh) Modified on 1/11/2018 (kti). (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#9

(#9) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Day To Day Imports, Inc. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/16/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

#4

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC., (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

#1

(#9) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by Plaintiff Day To Day Imports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Akiva Nourollah in support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq. in support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #3 Exhibit #1 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #4 Exhibit #2 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #5 Exhibit #3 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #6 Exhibit #4 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #7 Exhibit #5 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq., #8 Exhibit #6 to the declaration of Aryeh Kaufman, Esq.)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Costs against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/16/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Rule 41 Motion, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Tan, Lisa) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR ONE WEEK FROM FEBRUARY 2, 2018 TO FEBRUARY 9, 2018 #23 by Judge Dolly M. Gee, re Stipulation to The Court GRANTS the parties request to continue the date of the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #13] from February 2, 2018 to February 9, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (bp) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from February 2, 2018 to February 9, 2018 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by plaintiff Day To Day Imports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby ORDERS the Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date #21 be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules 5-4.4 Submission of Proposed Orders. (kti) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER #22 ] Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from February 2, 2018 to February 9, 2018 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by plaintiff Day To Day Imports, Inc.(Kaufman, Aryeh) Modified on 1/11/2018 (kti). (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey M. Dureska to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FH Group International, Inc., designating Lisa Tan as local counsel #19 . (gk) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey M. Dureska to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21047037) filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate, #3 Certificate, #4 Certificate) (Tan, Lisa) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David Ludwig to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FH Group International, Inc., designating Lisa Tan as local counsel #14 , #17 . (gk) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David Ludwig to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/11/2017, Receipt No. 097320951416) filed by Defendant FH Group International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate, #3 Certificate, #4 Certificate, #5 Certificate, #6 Certificate) (Tan, Lisa) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 16-05 (identical case) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-08291 DMG(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 11/20/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant FH Group International, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Day To Day Imports, Inc. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC., (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20821733 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.. (Attorney Aryeh L Kaufman added to party DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.(pty:pla))(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FH Group International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEOFFREY M DURESKA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ludwig