This case was last updated from PACER on 05/06/2020 at 22:38:16 (UTC).

Dawson et al v. Trent et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Dawson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Trent. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claria Horn Boom and Robert E. Wier. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00559

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Claria Horn Boom

Robert E. Wier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kimberli Sageser

Lisa Dawson

Defendants

Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Sanofi

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.

Sanofi-Synthelabo Inc.

Robert Trent

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Horace Hambrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kellie Marie Collins

Attorney at Golden Law Office, PLLC

771 Corporate Drive, Suite 750

Lexington, KY 40503

J. Dale Golden

Attorney at Golden Law Office, PLLC

771 Corporate Drive, Suite 750

Lexington, KY 40503

Laraclay Drake Parker

Attorney at Golden Law Office, PLLC

771 Corporate Drive, Suite 750

Lexington, KY 40503

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

David C. DeGreeff

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Brandon D. Henry

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney L. Rosser

101 Prosperous Place, Suite 100

Lexington, KY 40509

Clayton L. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson & Havens, PSC

101 Prosperous Place, Suite 100

Lexington, KY 40509

Courtney Lynn Rosser

Attorney at Robinson & Havens, PSC

101 Prosperous Place, Suite 100

Lexington, KY 40509

Carol Dan Browning

Attorney at Stites & Harbison, PLLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202

Emily Larish Startsman

Attorney at Stites & Harbison PLLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2300 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507

William F. Northrip

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

111 S. Wacker Drive, 51St Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Donald L. Miller, II

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lou

9300 Shelbyville Road, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40222

William K. Burnham

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lou

9300 Shelbyville Road, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40222

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Remand and REMANDS this case to the Scott Circuit. Further the Court DENIED as MOOT Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Stay. Trents, Hambricks, and Sanofis pending dismissal efforts (DE #4 , #5 & #9 ), which the Court does not tackle, properly fall within the state courts adjudicative ambit. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/29/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Scott Circuit (Entered: 08/29/2019)

44 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Order

44 #1

Exhibit A - Tendered Second Supplemental Brief

14 #3

Proposed Order

14 #2

Exhibit 2 - Opinion and Order in Claycomb v. Commonwealth

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Scott Circuit docket sheet

#14

(#45) OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Remand and REMANDS this case to the Scott Circuit. Further the Court DENIED as MOOT Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Stay. Trents, Hambricks, and Sanofis pending dismissal efforts (DE #4 , #5 & #9 ), which the Court does not tackle, properly fall within the state courts adjudicative ambit. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/29/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Scott Circuit (Entered: 08/29/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plf's Motion for Stay

#11

(#45) OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Remand and REMANDS this case to the Scott Circuit. Further the Court DENIED as MOOT Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Stay. Trents, Hambricks, and Sanofis pending dismissal efforts (DE #4 , #5 & #9 ), which the Court does not tackle, properly fall within the state courts adjudicative ambit. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/29/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Scott Circuit (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

State Court Record Exhibit H

1 #7

State Court Record Exhibit G

1 #6

State Court Record Exhibit F

1 #5

State Court Record Exhibit E

1 #4

State Court Record Exhibit D

1 #3

State Court Record Exhibit C

1 #2

State Court Record Exhibit B

1 #1

State Court Record Exhibit A

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Remand and REMANDS this case to the Scott Circuit. Further the Court DENIED as MOOT Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Stay. Trents, Hambricks, and Sanofis pending dismissal efforts (DE #4 , #5 & #9 ), which the Court does not tackle, properly fall within the state courts adjudicative ambit. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/29/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Scott Circuit (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Brandon Henry re #44 MOTION for Leave to File Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A,""Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (JJ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION for Leave to File A Second Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC's Motin to Dismiss by Lisa Dawson, Kimberli Sageser (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henry, Brandon) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (JJ). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief to Address New Tenth Circuit Opinion by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Supplemental Reply ISO Mt to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Startsman, Emily) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (JJ). (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: #42 Notice of Filing (KM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF FILING re #41 Order by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint)(Startsman, Emily) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (KM). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER: The Court ORDERS Defendnat, as removal proponent, to remedy deficiency by filing the complete Complaint NLT 7/29/2019, at noon. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 7/25/2019.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: IT IS ORDERED that the following civil matters be REASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert E. Wier. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to file a copy of this Order in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel, or, in the case of a pro se party, to the last known address of such a party. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/22/2019.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: IT IS ORDERED that the following case be REASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert E. Wier. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to file a copy of this Order in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel, or, in the case of a pro se party, to the last known address of such a party. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom.(KM)cc: COR Modified on 7/22/2019 (KM). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria Horn Boom for review: #37 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (KM) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (Startsman, Emily) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Memorandum of Law in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - 11/26/07 Citizen Petition, #2 Exhibit Ex B - 09/08/09 FDA Ltr to Mix, #3 Exhibit Ex C - 09/29/09 Petition for Reconsideration, #4 Exhibit Ex D - 03/08/12 - FDA Ltr to Mix, #5 Exhibit Ex E - PDR for Clomid, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Startsman, Emily) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Courtney L. Rosser by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. (Attachments: #1 Admission Check)(JLM) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Emily L. Startsman. #1 Notice of Removal,has been filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLM) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (JLM) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Trent, #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Horace Hambrick filed by Lisa Dawson, Kimberli Sageser. (Filed in state court, see doc. #1 ). (JLM) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Horace Hambrick (Filed in state court, see doc. #1 ). (JLM) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Trent (Filed in state court, see doc. #1 . (JLM) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of service by Lisa Dawson, Kimberli Sageser via certified mail to Sanofi served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018 (Filed in State Court, see doc. #1 . (JLM) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Scott County, Kentucky, case number 18-CI-00501. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184528), filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A, #2 State Court Record Exhibit B, #3 State Court Record Exhibit C, #4 State Court Record Exhibit D, #5 State Court Record Exhibit E, #6 State Court Record Exhibit F, #7 State Court Record Exhibit G, #8 State Court Record Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.