This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2018 at 07:58:44 (UTC).

Dawkins v. HHS Environmental Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 Dawkins filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HHS Environmental Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00178

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Dawkins

Defendant

HHS Environmental Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas S Hamill

Attorney at Burnette, Dobson & Pinchak

711 Cherry Street

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Gregg J Lytle

Attorney at McDaniel Acord, PLLC

9343 East 95Th Court

Tulsa, OK 74133

Sharel V Hooper

Attorney at Spears, Moore, Rebman & Williams P.C.

601 Market Street, Suite 400

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Joseph Alan Jackson, II

Attorney at Spears, Moore, Rebman & Williams P.C.

601 Market Street, Suite 400

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hamill, Douglas) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Mediation (Harrison, John) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on September 19, 2018. (KLWa, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HHS Environmental Services, LLC.(Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond Pursuant to Rule 12.1(a) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee by HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

7 #1

Other Gregg J. Lytle Certificate of Good Standing - The United State District Co

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregg J. Lytle ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3754097.) by HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Gregg J. Lytle Certificate of Good Standing - The United State District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma)(Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Dawkins. HHS Environmental Services, LLC served on 8/9/2018. (Hamill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

1 #2

Summons Civil Summons

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HHS Environmental Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3735760.), filed by Mary Dawkins. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Civil Summons)(Hamill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hamill, Douglas) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPORT of Mediation (Harrison, John) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on September 19, 2018. (KLWa, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HHS Environmental Services, LLC.(Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger on 08/29/2018. (BRS) Modified on 8/30/2018 (KFB, ). This Order serviced via US Mail to attorney Gregg Lytle. (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregg J. Lytle ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3754097.) filed by HHS Environmental Services, LLC as to HHS Environmental Services, LLC (KFB, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond Pursuant to Rule 12.1(a) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee by HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregg J. Lytle ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3754097.) by HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Gregg J. Lytle Certificate of Good Standing - The United State District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma)(Jackson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Dawkins. HHS Environmental Services, LLC served on 8/9/2018. (Hamill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to HHS Environmental Services, LLC. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against HHS Environmental Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3735760.), filed by Mary Dawkins. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Civil Summons)(Hamill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less