This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 08:45:28 (UTC).

Davis v. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2017 Davis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-02795

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin Davis

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Angela Calvin

Defendants

Bob Ross

Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel R Watkins

Attorney at Watkins and Letofsky

8215 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 265

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Theresa M. Santos

Attorney at WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP

8215 S. Eastern Ave., Suite 265, Las Vegas

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Defendant Attorneys

Jason M Gerber

Attorney at Marquis Aurbach Coffing

10001 Park Run Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Sammantha Tillotson

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Nicholas Crosby

Attorney at Marquis & Aurbach

10001 Park Run Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Nathan Andrew Schacht

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

1801 California St., Ste. 4400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER Granting #69 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendant Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schacht, Nathan) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #65 the Motion to Substitute Proper Party is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal on or before 6/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NON-OPPOSITION to #65 Motion to Substitute Party, by Plaintiff Kevin Davis. (Santos, Theresa) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) STATUS REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT by Plaintiff Kevin Davis. (Santos, Theresa) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) MOTION to Substitute Party and Suggestion of Death by Plaintiff Kevin Davis. Responses due by 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: Death Certificate of Kevin Davis, #3 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Angela Calvin, #4 Exhibit 3: Holographic Will, #5 Exhibit 4: Durable Power of Attorney, #6 Exhibit 5: Waiver of Service by Angela Calvin.) (Santos, Theresa) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/12/2019. Pursuant to the #62 Notice of Settlement, IT IS ORDERED that #30 , #42 and #47 , all pending motions are DISMISSED without prejudice to refiling.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/6/2019. In light of the filing of #62 Notice of Settlement, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file settlement documents, stipulation for dismissal or joint status report within 60 days. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE of Settlement by Kevin Davis. (Santos, Theresa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Docket(#61) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/29/2019. Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the hearing set for February 8, 2019 is vacated. The Court will contact the parties as to the resetting. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: #1 Complaint. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. answer due 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Gerber, Jason) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason M Gerber on behalf of Defendant Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Gerber, Jason) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Kevin Davis. (Watkins, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kevin Davis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Watkins, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiff Kevin Davis. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ocean Spray)(Watkins, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400), filed by Kevin Davis. Proof of service due by 2/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc Welfare Benefits Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theresa M. Santos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R Watkins