This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 07:38:29 (UTC).

Davis v. I.R.S.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Davis filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against I R S. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karla R. Spaulding and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-02052

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karla R. Spaulding

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dominique A. Davis

Orlando, FL 32829

Defendant

I.R.S.

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#7

(#7) MOTION to Continue Complaint by Dominique A. Davis. (Submitted with the motion is a Complaint which contains tax return forms which include the Plaintiff's social security number and has not been scanned) (RDO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#10

(#10) (STRICKEN BY #11 ORDER) OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Dominique A. Davis. (RDO) Modified on 1/25/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) withdrawing #6 Report and Recommendations.; granting #7 Motion to Continue Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/18/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Dominique A. Davis recommending the District Judge dsmiss this action, deny all pending motions as moot and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/14/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to remove the Complaint (and exhibits thereto) filed at Doc. #4 from CM/ECF and maintain those documents in paper form until the case is closed. On or before January 10, 2019, Plaintiff must file a redacted amended complaint (and exhibits thereto) following the instructions in the.pdf order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/20/2018. (Spaulding, Karla) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against I.R.S. with Jury Demand filed by Dominique A. Davis.(DMA) Modified on 12/21/2018 (RDO). (RDO). Modified on 1/22/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dominique A. Davis. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER to strike re: #10 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Dominique A. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/24/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/18/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) re 1 Complaint filed by Dominique A. Davis. The Clerk shall remove the document from the public record and the Plaintiff is order to file a redacted copy of the Complaint on or before 12/16/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/4/2018. (RDO) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER to strike re: #10 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Dominique A. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/24/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (STRICKEN BY #11 ORDER) OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Dominique A. Davis. (RDO) Modified on 1/25/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) withdrawing #6 Report and Recommendations.; granting #7 Motion to Continue Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/18/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/18/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Continue Complaint by Dominique A. Davis. (Submitted with the motion is a Complaint which contains tax return forms which include the Plaintiff's social security number and has not been scanned) (RDO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Dominique A. Davis recommending the District Judge dsmiss this action, deny all pending motions as moot and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/14/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to remove the Complaint (and exhibits thereto) filed at Doc. #4 from CM/ECF and maintain those documents in paper form until the case is closed. On or before January 10, 2019, Plaintiff must file a redacted amended complaint (and exhibits thereto) following the instructions in the.pdf order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/20/2018. (Spaulding, Karla) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against I.R.S. with Jury Demand filed by Dominique A. Davis.(DMA) Modified on 12/21/2018 (RDO). (RDO). Modified on 1/22/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) re 1 Complaint filed by Dominique A. Davis. The Clerk shall remove the document from the public record and the Plaintiff is order to file a redacted copy of the Complaint on or before 12/16/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/4/2018. (RDO) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dominique A. Davis. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against I.R.S. with Jury Demand filed by Dominique A. Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.