This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:44:30 (UTC).

Davis et al v. Seatran Marine L L C

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Seatran Marine L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carol B Whitehurst and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01532

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian Davis

Harold Marks

Defendant

Seatran Marine L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lucas Scott Colligan

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2053

Lafayette, LA 70502-2053

Jacob Houston Hargett

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2053

Lafayette, LA 70502-2053

Joseph Frazier Gaar, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2053

Lafayette, LA 70502-2053

Jason M Welborn

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2053

Lafayette, LA 70502-2053

Defendant Attorneys

Alfred J Rufty, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty

650 Poydras St Ste 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cindy Galpin Martin

Attorney at Harris & Rufty

650 Poydras St Ste 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Rufus C Harris, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty

650 Poydras St Ste 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seatran Marine L L C. (aty,Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Answer to Complaint, sent to Rufus C Harris, III on behalf of Seatran Marine L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2018. (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Seatran Marine L L C.(Attorney Rufus C Harris, III added to party Seatran Marine L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Davis, Harold Marks. Seatran Marine L L C served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (aty,Welborn, Jason) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seatran Marine L L C (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #2

Proposed summons/writ

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Seatran Marine L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3813392) filed by Brian Davis, Harold Marks. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Jason M Welborn added to party Brian Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Jason M Welborn added to party Harold Marks(pty:pla))(aty,Welborn, Jason) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seatran Marine L L C. (aty,Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Answer to Complaint, sent to Rufus C Harris, III on behalf of Seatran Marine L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2018. (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Seatran Marine L L C.(Attorney Rufus C Harris, III added to party Seatran Marine L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Davis, Harold Marks. Seatran Marine L L C served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (aty,Welborn, Jason) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seatran Marine L L C (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Seatran Marine L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3813392) filed by Brian Davis, Harold Marks. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Jason M Welborn added to party Brian Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Jason M Welborn added to party Harold Marks(pty:pla))(aty,Welborn, Jason) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seatran Marine L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cindy Galpin Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred Jackson Rufty, III