This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 06:45:45 (UTC).

Davis et al v. Detroit Public Schools Community District et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 Davis filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Detroit Public Schools Community District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David R. Grand and Mark A. Goldsmith. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-12100

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

D. Etta Wilcoxon

Robert Davis

Defendants

Detroit Public Schools

Detroit Public Schools Community District

Olympia Entertainment Events Center LLC

Dr. Iris Taylor

National Basketball Association

Palace Sports and Entertainment LLC

Detroit Public Schools Community District Board of Education

Intervenor Defendants

Detroit Downtown Development Authority

Detroit Brownfield Redevelopment Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Floyd E. Allen

Kevin J. Campbell

Lawrence T. Garcia

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

David H. Fink

Schuyler E. von Oeyen

R. Edward Boucher

Darryl Bressack

Jeffrey M. Sangster

Anthony M. Sciara

Tyler Patrick Phillips

Nathan J. Fink

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) OPINION & ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend this Court's July 24, 2017Order (Dkt. 49 ) and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Dkt. 48 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)

#47

(#47) OPINION & ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Detroit Public Schools Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 25 ); Granting Intervenor Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 27 ); Denying as Moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(Dkt. 26 ); and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (Dkt. 43 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) OPINION & ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend this Court's July 24, 2017Order (Dkt. 49 ) and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Dkt. 48 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) OPINION & ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Detroit Public Schools Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 25 ); Granting Intervenor Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 27 ); Denying as Moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(Dkt. 26 ); and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (Dkt. 43 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Detroit Public Schools Community District is a litigant

Latest cases where National Basketball Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.