This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/25/2018 at 07:09:24 (UTC).

Juan L. Davila v. Amerimax Home Products, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Juan L Davila filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amerimax Home Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-02069

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan L Davila

Defendants

Euramax International, Inc.

Amerimax Home Products, Inc.

Omnimax International, Inc.

DOES 1 through 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Keith Haines

Daniel Johnson Brown

Sean M Blakely

Defendant Attorneys

Lara Levine

Timothy M Rusche

 

Court Documents

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order Granting Relief from Central District of California Local Rule 23

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA LOCAL RULE 23-3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #17 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is relieved from Local Rule 23-3. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties file a separate Stipulation and Proposed Order proposing a class certification briefing schedule when they file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (gk) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Central District of California Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Juan L Davila. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Relief from Central District of California Local Rule 23-3)(Haines, Paul) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-02069 AB(SPx). (rn) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Compliance filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc.. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other)[11 by Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Errata. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Errata Regarding Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt ISO Removal [attached as Exhibit B to Notice of Removal] filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc.. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:18-cv-02069-CAS (SPx). (et) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/26/2018

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Juan L Davila, upon Defendant Euramax International, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018; Omnimax International, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (et) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Amerimax Home Products, Inc., Does 1 through 100, Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Juan L Davila. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/3/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration #5 , Declaration #4 served on September 26, 2018. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc., identifying 1. Juan Davila (Plaintiff) 2. Ominimax International, Inc.. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Christopher Berg re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc.. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Mary Geidner re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc.. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Timothy M. Rusche re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc.. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Euramax International, Inc., Omnimax International, Inc.. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Riverside, case number RIC1813748 Receipt No: 0973-22488287 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Omnimax International, Inc., Euramax International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Lara Levine added to party Euramax International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lara Levine added to party Omnimax International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Levine, Lara) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less