This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 07:43:30 (UTC).

Davenport v. Caledonia Haulers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Davenport filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Caledonia Haulers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Davenport

Defendants

Caledonia Haulers, Inc.

Caledonia Haulers, LLC

Caledonia Haulers, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark D Sherinian

Attorney at Sherinian & Hasso Law Firm

3737 Woodland Ave, Suite 630, ***Ecf

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Emily Elaine Wilson

Attorney at Sherinian and Hasso Law Firm

521 E Locust St, Suite 300, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Melissa Carol Hasso

Attorney at Sherinian and Hasso Law Firm

521 E Locust St, Suite 300, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly R Baier

Attorney at Bradley & Riley

Po Box 2804, 2007 First Avenue Se, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-2804

Melissa Ammann Carrington

Attorney at Bradley & Riley, PC

One South Gilbert Street, Tower Place, Ecf

Iowa City, IA 52240

 

Court Documents

22 #2

Declaration

22 #1

Motion for Discovery Pursuant to 56(d)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Discovery Pursuant to 56(d) past deadline by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Motion for Discovery Pursuant to 56(d), #2 Declaration) (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

21 #1

Brief

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

13 #2

Statement of Material Facts

13 #1

Brief

9 #1

Brief

#9

(#13) RESISTANCE to Motion re #9 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Larry Davenport. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts, #4 Appendix) (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#5

(#5) DOCKET Annotation: Please find new removal case packet attached. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#4

(#4) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Larry Davenport. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/3/2019. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Caledonia Haulers, Inc., Caledonia Haulers, LLC. (Carrington, Melissa) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Rule 81 Certification

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court in and for Linn County, case number LACV091512. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2824442), filed by Caledonia Haulers, Inc., Caledonia Haulers, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 2/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Rule 81 Certification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baier, Kelly) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Discovery Pursuant to 56(d) past deadline by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Motion for Discovery Pursuant to 56(d), #2 Declaration) (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY to #13 Resistance to #9 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Reponse to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts, #2 Supplemental Appendix in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment) (Carrington, Melissa) Modified text on 1/28/2019 (mmc). (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER re #17 UNRESISTED Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by Larry Davenport: The Court hereby vacates its prior order at #18 . The Clerk of Court is directed to place the appendix at #13 -4 under seal. Plaintiff does not need to take any action regarding redacting the appendix at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/24/2019. (pac) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) (VACATED) ORDER denying #17 Unresisted Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Plaintiff shall submit a redacted version of the appendix to the Clerk of Court by 1/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/23/2019. (pac) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (pac). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) UNRESISTED Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC, filed by Larry Davenport. (ksy) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Unresisted Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Clerk's Office is directed to detach and file the Amended Complaint attachedat Doc. 14-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/22/19. (ksy) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) UNRESISTED Motion for Leave to Amend Petition by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition) (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESISTANCE to Motion re #9 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Larry Davenport. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts, #4 Appendix) (Wilson, Emily) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer due from All Defendants 12/24/18. Pursuant to order #7 . (dmc) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Petition is December 24, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/11/18. (dmc) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC (Carrington, Melissa) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Set Deadlines: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/25/2018. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET Annotation: Please find new removal case packet attached. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Larry Davenport. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/3/2019. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified with parties, attorneys, and MAR. (mmc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Caledonia Haulers, Inc., Caledonia Haulers, LLC. (Carrington, Melissa) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court in and for Linn County, case number LACV091512. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2824442), filed by Caledonia Haulers, Inc., Caledonia Haulers, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 2/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Rule 81 Certification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baier, Kelly) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.