This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2019 at 07:09:25 (UTC).

Data Scape Limited v. Spotify USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Data Scape Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Spotify USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Consuelo B. Marshall and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-10653

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Data Scape Limited

Defendants

Spotify Technology S.A.

Spotify USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

C Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

1224 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X Wang

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Spotify USA Inc. answer now due 3/4/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited.(Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, upon Defendant Spotify USA Inc. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRANCES FERNANDEZ, AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE/NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS, INC. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Spotify Technology S.A. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#5

(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22953338 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Spotify USA Inc. answer now due 3/4/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited.(Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, upon Defendant Spotify USA Inc. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRANCES FERNANDEZ, AUTHORIZED EMPLOYEE/NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS, INC. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Spotify Technology S.A. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22953338 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spotify Technology S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Spotify USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Data Scape Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. Jay Chung