This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:57:31 (UTC).

Danna v. Compass One, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Danna filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Compass One, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas G. Wilson and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02440

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margaret Danna

Defendant

Compass One, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew K. Fenton

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602-3343

Defendant Attorney

Steven A. Siegel

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

Suite 800, 450 E Las Olas Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-2600

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 --motion for approval of settlement; dismissing the action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/19/2018. (BK) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Margaret Danna. Related case(s): yes (Fenton, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Compass One, LLC. Related case(s): no (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejduice by Compass One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER re #3 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/4/2018. (GSO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 6th Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 18-5765-CI filed in State Court on 8/31/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA053451 filed by Compass One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Compass One, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Margaret Danna. Filed in state court 8/31/2018.(CTR) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Compass One, LLC.(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 --motion for approval of settlement; dismissing the action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/19/2018. (BK) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejduice by Compass One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Margaret Danna. Related case(s): yes (Fenton, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Compass One, LLC. Related case(s): no (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Compass One, LLC.(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re #3 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/4/2018. (GSO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Compass One, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Margaret Danna. Filed in state court 8/31/2018.(CTR) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 6th Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 18-5765-CI filed in State Court on 8/31/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA053451 filed by Compass One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.