This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2017 at 02:35:46 (UTC).

Daniels v. Carter et al (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 11/29/2017 Daniels filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Carter INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Abdul K Kallon and T Michael Putnam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01996

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

Referral Judge

T Michael Putnam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvin H Daniels

Springville, AL 35146

Defendants

Steven T Marshall

Derrick Carter

 

Court Documents

12 #1

*Restricted*

#12

(#12) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:17-cv-00606. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#11

(#11) OPINION AND ORDER: This case is before the court on the recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge that the case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C.2241(d). There are no objections to the recommendation. After an independent and de novo review of the record, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The magistrate judge's recommendation (doc. no. #3 ) is adopted. (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/29/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#10

(#10) ORDERED that this #9 motion is GRANTED to the extent provided herein. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner is GRANTED an extension from November 10, 2017, to and including November 22, 2017, to file objections to the Recommendation entered on September 18, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/17/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/17/2017)

#9

(#9) FINAL MOTION for Extension of Time by Alvin H. Daniels. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/16/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Alvin H. Daniels. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

#7

(#7) ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED to the extent provided herein. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner is GRANTED an extension from October 27, 2017, to and including November 10, 2017, to file objections to the Recommendation entered on September 18, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/27/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/27/2017)

#6

(#6) SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time by Alvin H. Daniels. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/27/2017)

#5

(#5) ORDERED that this #4 motion be and is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner is GRANTED an extension from October 6, 2017, to and including October 27, 2017, to file objections to the Recommendation entered on September 18, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/6/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2017)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time by Alvin H. Daniels. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2017)

#3

(#3) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/18/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 09/18/2017)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Alvin H. Daniels. (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:17-cv-00606. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) OPINION AND ORDER: This case is before the court on the recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge that the case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C.2241(d). There are no objections to the recommendation. After an independent and de novo review of the record, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The magistrate judge's recommendation (doc. no. #3 ) is adopted. (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/29/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDERED that this #9 motion is GRANTED to the extent provided herein. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner is GRANTED an extension from November 10, 2017, to and including November 22, 2017, to file objections to the Recommendation entered on September 18, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/17/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FINAL MOTION for Extension of Time by Alvin H. Daniels. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Alvin H. Daniels. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED to the extent provided herein. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner is GRANTED an extension from October 27, 2017, to and including November 10, 2017, to file objections to the Recommendation entered on September 18, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/27/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time by Alvin H. Daniels. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDERED that this #4 motion be and is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner is GRANTED an extension from October 6, 2017, to and including October 27, 2017, to file objections to the Recommendation entered on September 18, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/6/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time by Alvin H. Daniels. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/18/2017. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 09/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Alvin H. Daniels. (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Alvin H. Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less