This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2018 at 07:45:55 (UTC).

Daniels (ID 0103144) v. Schnurr et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 Daniels ID 0103144 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Schnurr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Crow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-03187

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeoloni Daniels

Hutchinson, KS 67504

Defendants

(fnu) Rodgers

Jason (lnu)

Dan Schnurr

Douglas Burris

Interested Party

Kansas Department of Corrections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Roger W. Slead

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Richard M. Acosta

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Interested Party Attorney

Jeffrey L. Cowger

Attorney at Kansas Department of Corrections - Topeka

714 Sw Jackson, Suite 300

Topeka, KS 66603

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER ENTERED: The Court finds ECF Doc. #11 is not an amended complaint nor a proper supplemental pleading. Therefore, the Martinez report ordered by theCourt (see ECF Doc. #7 ) shall not be expanded to include investigation into the allegations raised in that filing. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The Clerk of Court shall serve Defendants Schnurr, Burris, Rodgers and Jason (LNU), nurse at HCF, under the e-service pilot program in effect with the Kansas Department of Corrections. The Clerk of the Court shall enter KDOC as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez Report. Upon the filing of that report, KDOC may move for termination of this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Prisoner Case by Jason (lnu). (Acosta, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#13

(#13) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Acosta on behalf of Jason (lnu). (Acosta, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#12

(#12) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Roger W. Slead on behalf of Jason (lnu). (Slead, Roger) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#11

(#11) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Financial Status in Support of Application for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#8

(#8) SERVICE ORDER ENTERED: The Clerk of the Court shall notify the Kansas Attorney General ("AG") and the KDOC of this Service Order. The Court requests that Defendants waive formal service of process. The AG and/or the KDOC shall have thirty (30) days from entry of this Service Order to file a Waiver of Service Executed and/or a Waiver of Service Unexecuted. Upon the electronic filing of the Waiver of Service Executed, KDOC shall have sixty (60) days to prepare a report pursuant to Martinez v. Aaron, 570 F.2d 317 (10th Cir. 1978). Upon the filing of that report, the AG/Defendant shall have an additional sixty (60) days to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. In those cases where a Waiver of Service Unexecuted is filed, the KDOC shall have ten (10) days from the filing of the Waiver of Service Unexecuted, to supply the Clerk of Court with the last known forwarding addresses for former employees, said addresses to be placed under seal and used only for the purpose of attempting to effect service of process. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. Response deadline 8/30/2018. (smnd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER ENTERED: The Court finds ECF Doc. #11 is not an amended complaint nor a proper supplemental pleading. Therefore, the Martinez report ordered by theCourt (see ECF Doc. #7 ) shall not be expanded to include investigation into the allegations raised in that filing. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Prisoner Case by Jason (lnu). (Acosta, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Acosta on behalf of Jason (lnu). (Acosta, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Roger W. Slead on behalf of Jason (lnu). (Slead, Roger) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 350.00, receipt number T4631012140. (mls) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Financial Status in Support of Application for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SERVICE ORDER ENTERED: The Clerk of the Court shall notify the Kansas Attorney General ("AG") and the KDOC of this Service Order. The Court requests that Defendants waive formal service of process. The AG and/or the KDOC shall have thirty (30) days from entry of this Service Order to file a Waiver of Service Executed and/or a Waiver of Service Unexecuted. Upon the electronic filing of the Waiver of Service Executed, KDOC shall have sixty (60) days to prepare a report pursuant to Martinez v. Aaron, 570 F.2d 317 (10th Cir. 1978). Upon the filing of that report, the AG/Defendant shall have an additional sixty (60) days to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. In those cases where a Waiver of Service Unexecuted is filed, the KDOC shall have ten (10) days from the filing of the Waiver of Service Unexecuted, to supply the Clerk of Court with the last known forwarding addresses for former employees, said addresses to be placed under seal and used only for the purpose of attempting to effect service of process. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The Clerk of Court shall serve Defendants Schnurr, Burris, Rodgers and Jason (LNU), nurse at HCF, under the e-service pilot program in effect with the Kansas Department of Corrections. The Clerk of the Court shall enter KDOC as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez Report. Upon the filing of that report, KDOC may move for termination of this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $3.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Jeoloni Daniels by regular mail. Response deadline 8/30/2018. (smnd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (smnd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jeoloni Daniels (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less