This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2018 at 08:03:21 (UTC).

Daniel v. Mays

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Daniel filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Mays. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward G. Bryant, James D. Todd and J. Daniel Breen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01187

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edward G. Bryant

Presiding Judges

James D. Todd

J. Daniel Breen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Donavan E. Daniel

Nashville, TN 37209

Respondent

Tony Mays

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Thomas Austin Watkins

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, P.O. Box 20207, War Memorial Building, 301 6Th Avenue North

Nashville, TN 37243

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE HABEAS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/1/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

6 #1

Judicial Card

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Daniel Breen for all further proceedings. Judge James D. Todd no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/28/18. (cdi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2018: #1 Judicial Card) (cdi). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

3 #1

Inmate Trust Fund Affidavit and Transactions

#4

(#4) Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donavan E. Daniel. (csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donavan E. Daniel. (Attachment(s) #1 Inmate Trust Fund Affidavit and Transactions) (csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

2 #8

Envelope

2 #5

Exhibit 5 Partial Transcript

2 #4

Exhibit 4 Partial Transcript

2 #3

Exhibit 3 Partial Transcript

2 #1

Exhibit 1 Partial Transcript

#2

(#2) PRO SE Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 filed by Donavan E. Daniel against Tony Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Partial Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 Partial Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 Partial Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 Partial Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 Partial Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 Partial Transcript, #7 Previous Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Case 05-2273), #8 Envelope)(csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

1 #1

Motion to United States Court of Appeals for Order Authorizing Second or Succes

#1

(#1) United States Court of Appeals Order granting application for a second or successive habeas petition (Attachments: #1 Motion to United States Court of Appeals for Order Authorizing Second or Successive Application for 28 U.S.C. 2254)(csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • (#9) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number J4676007267. (mbm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Austin Watkins on behalf of Tony Mays (Watkins, Thomas) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE HABEAS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/1/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Daniel Breen for all further proceedings. Judge James D. Todd no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/28/18. (cdi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2018: #1 Judicial Card) (cdi). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donavan E. Daniel. (csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donavan E. Daniel. (Attachment(s) #1 Inmate Trust Fund Affidavit and Transactions) (csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 filed by Donavan E. Daniel against Tony Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Partial Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 Partial Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 Partial Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 Partial Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 Partial Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 Partial Transcript, #7 Previous Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Case 05-2273), #8 Envelope)(csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) United States Court of Appeals Order granting application for a second or successive habeas petition (Attachments: #1 Motion to United States Court of Appeals for Order Authorizing Second or Successive Application for 28 U.S.C. 2254)(csf) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less