This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 07:55:40 (UTC).

Dandy v. Travelers Aid Housing

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Dandy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Travelers Aid Housing. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond, John J. McConnell, Jr. and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00647

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judges

John J. McConnell, Jr.

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noel D.E Dandy

Providence, RI 0903

Defendant

Travelers Aid Housing

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Noel D.E Dandy re Text Order on 1/4/2019, denying Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Jackson, Kerrie) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#7

(#7) Letter sent to Noel D.E Dandy requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Aid Housing filed by Noel D.E Dandy.(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint on or before December 31, 2018 which complies with Rule 8's "short and plain statement" requirement and allows the Court to understand the legal and factual bases for Plaintiff's claims and to determine if the Complaint should proceed after review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Failure of Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint which complies with Rule 8 as ORDERED herein will result in a recommendation to Chief Judge Smith that Plaintiff's IFP Motion be DENIED and this pending Complaint DISMISSED without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/4/2018. (Noel, Jeannine) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL entered: District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/3/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order from the State of Rhode Island 6 District Court filed by Noel D.E Dandy. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Noel D.E Dandy. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Waiver of Service (2)

1 #2

Waiver of Service (1)

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Noel D.E Dandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Waiver of Service (1), #3 Waiver of Service (2), #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Noel D.E Dandy re Text Order on 1/4/2019, denying Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Jackson, Kerrie) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter sent to Noel D.E Dandy requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER denying #3 MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order from the State of Rhode Island 6 District Court . Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from a state court judgment or order is an impermissible attempt to challenge or appeal a state court judgment in federal court, and thus it is barred by the Rooker- Feldman doctrine. See Dandy v. State of RI, Case No. 10-286 ML, 2010 WL 3074353 at * 2 (D. R.I. July 15, 2010). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/4/2019. (Noel, Jeannine) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/4/2019. (Noel, Jeannine) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Aid Housing filed by Noel D.E Dandy.(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order from the State of Rhode Island 6 District Court referred for Report and Recommendation to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint on or before December 31, 2018 which complies with Rule 8's "short and plain statement" requirement and allows the Court to understand the legal and factual bases for Plaintiff's claims and to determine if the Complaint should proceed after review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Failure of Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint which complies with Rule 8 as ORDERED herein will result in a recommendation to Chief Judge Smith that Plaintiff's IFP Motion be DENIED and this pending Complaint DISMISSED without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/4/2018. (Noel, Jeannine) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL entered: District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/3/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Regarding: #1 Complaint. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. Filer is directed to submit a redacted version. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order from the State of Rhode Island 6 District Court filed by Noel D.E Dandy. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Noel D.E Dandy. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Noel D.E Dandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Waiver of Service (1), #3 Waiver of Service (2), #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Regarding: #1 Complaint. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. Filer is directed to submit a redacted version. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order from the State of Rhode Island 6 District Court filed by Noel D.E Dandy. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Noel D.E Dandy. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Noel D.E Dandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Waiver of Service (1), #3 Waiver of Service (2), #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less