This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:28:28 (UTC).

Damus v. Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Damus filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith E. Levy and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-12821

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judith E. Levy

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ansly Damus

Defendants and Respondents

Ronald Vitiello

Rebecca Adducci

Kirstjen Nielsen

Kathy Rose

Jefferson Sessions

Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael J. Steinberg

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Fund of Michigan

2966 Woodward Avenue

Detroit, MI 48201

Michael K. Tan

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Joseph Carey

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Ohio Foundation

1108 City Park Avenue, Suite 203

Columbus, OH 43206

Freda Levenson

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Ohio Foundation

4506 Chester Ave

Cleveland, OH 44103

David Hausman

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Respondent Attorneys

James J. Carty

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - EDMI

211 W. Fort Street, Suite 2001

Detroit, MI 48226

David M. Smith

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co., LPA

34305 Solon Road, Suite 100

Solon, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

#23

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#22

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#21

(#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER Expediting the Motion Hearing on Defendants #12 & #14 MOTIONS to Dismiss. (Sur-Reply due by 10/30/2018 and Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#20

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#19

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#18

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#16

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#14

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) ORDER Directing Service re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Response due by 10/9/2018 and Reply due by 10/16/2018) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Freda Levenson on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Levenson, Freda) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SUR-REPLY re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER Expediting the Motion Hearing on Defendants #12 & #14 MOTIONS to Dismiss. (Sur-Reply due by 10/30/2018 and Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION re #19 Reply to Response to Motion, #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion Seeking Expedited Hearing or Decision and Petitioner Sur-Reply by Ansly Damus (Hausman, David) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rebecca Adducci, Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Sessions. (Carty, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by David Joseph Carey on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Carey, David) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION to Dismiss and #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #14 MOTION to Dismiss. (SBur) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Kathy Rose. (Smith, David) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Granting in Part Respondent's #7 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Response due by 10/12/2018) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Smith on behalf of Kathy Rose. (Smith, David) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kathy Rose. (Smith, David) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James J. Carty appearing on behalf of Rebecca Adducci, Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kathy Rose, Jefferson Sessions, Ronald Vitiello (Carty, James) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David Hausman on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Directing Service re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Response due by 10/9/2018 and Reply due by 10/16/2018) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ansly Damus (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Elizabeth Ford, #3 Exhibit 1.A-Parole Request, #4 Exhibit 1.B-Parol Denial, #5 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Ansly Damus) (Tan, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Tan on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Tan, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ansly Damus against All Defendants, Receipt No: 0645-6898549 - Fee: $ 5. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.