This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 08:00:07 (UTC).

Daley et al v. Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C. et al (TWP1)

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Daley filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Mountain Empire Radiology, P C TWP1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas W Phillips and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W Phillips

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Daley

Kristen Daley

Defendants

MCOT, Inc.

Timothy D Hall

Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Kevin Chapman

Attorney at Bedard Law Group, PC

4855 River Green Parkway, Suite 310

Duluth, GA 30096

John H Bedard, Jr

Attorney at Bedard Law Group, PC

4855 River Green Parkway, Suite 310

Duluth, GA 30096

Michael S Lattier

Attorney at Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport

1212 N. Eastman Road, P O Box 3740

Kingsport, TN 37664

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by James Daley, Kristen Daley (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

17 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent

#17

(#17) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#16

(#16) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C.. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#15

(#15) Certificate of Corporate Interest by MCOT, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ballad Health for MCOT, Inc.. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

6 #2

Other ROS - MER

6 #1

Other ROS - MCOT

#6

(#8) STIPULATION re #6 Summons Returned Executed(non-USA), #1 Complaint, (Stipulation for Extenstion of Time to Respond to Plainitffs' Complaint) by Timothy D Hall, MCOT, Inc.. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/3/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/3/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/3/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Timothy D Hall, MCOT, Inc., Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

1 #3

Summons - All Defendants

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Aug 2, 2017 Coll Lawsuit

#1

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C..(Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by James Daley, Kristen Daley (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C.. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Certificate of Corporate Interest by MCOT, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ballad Health for MCOT, Inc.. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Timothy D Hall.(Bedard, John) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MCOT, Inc..(Bedard, John) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C..(Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Lattier on behalf of Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Kevin Chapman. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/31/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Michael Kevin Chapman regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Michael K. Chapman) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3757916.) filed by Timothy D Hall, MCOT, Inc. (JCK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Michael K. Chapman) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3757916.) by Timothy D Hall, MCOT, Inc.. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION re #6 Summons Returned Executed(non-USA), #1 Complaint, (Stipulation for Extenstion of Time to Respond to Plainitffs' Complaint) by Timothy D Hall, MCOT, Inc.. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Bedard, Jr on behalf of Timothy D Hall, MCOT, Inc. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Daley, Kristen Daley. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Other ROS - MCOT, #2 Other ROS - MER)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/3/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/3/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/3/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Timothy D Hall, MCOT, Inc., Mountain Empire Radiology, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3733704.), filed by James Daley, Kristen Daley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aug 2, 2017 Coll Lawsuit, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - All Defendants)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less