This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2019 at 07:27:54 (UTC).

Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 Dakota, Minnesota Eastern Railroad Corporation filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and CJ Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation

Defendant

Marquette Transportation Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel E DeKoter

Attorney at DeKoter Thole & Dawson PLC

315 Ninth Street, Po Box 253, Ecf

Sibley, IA 51249

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Service by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC served on 1/2/2019. (DeKoter, Daniel) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (pac). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#3

(#3) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation (DeKoter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

2 #1

Civil Case Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Marquette Transportation Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2825429.), filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Scheduling Report due by 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DeKoter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of Service by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC served on 1/2/2019. (DeKoter, Daniel) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (pac). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation (DeKoter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/25/2018. (pac) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (conflicts list reviewed; none found). (pac) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Marquette Transportation Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2825429.), filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Scheduling Report due by 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DeKoter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.