This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2018 at 07:01:22 (UTC).

D3 LED, LLC v. Revolution Display, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 D3 LED, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Revolution Display, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02690

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D3 LED, LLC

Defendants

FULL THROTTLE FILMS, LLC

REVOLUTION DISPLAY, LLC

Video Equipment Rentals, LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ned M Gelhaar

Attorney at Enenstein Pham and Glass

100 N 18Th Street Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Antoinette Marie Tease

Attorney at Antoinette M Tease PLLC

175 North 27Th Street Suite 902

Billings, MT 95105

Teri T Pham

Attorney at Enenstein Pham and Glass

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Thomas D Kohler

Attorney at Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC

199 Main Street

Burlington, VT 05401

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Exhibit

#21

#20

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit 1 & 2

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER FOR STIPULATED MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #26 . Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC's answer due 6/8/2018. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 8, 2018 filed by Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC.(Kohler, Thomas) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:18-cv-2690 GW (JCx). (esa) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MDJAP case from Magistrate Judge Michale R. Wilner to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-02690 DSF (JCx). (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Video Equipment Rentals, LLC answer now due 5/30/2018; Full Throttle Films, LLC answer now due 5/30/2018; Revolution Display, LLC answer now due 5/30/2018, filed by Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC.(Attorney Thomas D Kohler added to party Video Equipment Rentals, LLC(pty:dft))(Kohler, Thomas) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Suggestion on Pendency of Brankruptcy filed by Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kohler, Thomas) (Entered: 04/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, upon Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George, Agent authorized to receive service of process for CSC Lawyers Inc Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, upon Defendant Revolution Display, LLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George, Agent authorized to receive service of process for CSC Lawyers Inc Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Full Throttle Films, LLC. (et) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Revolution Display, LLC. (et) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11- Statement of Consent) (et) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, identifying D3 LED, LLC; REVOLUTION DISPLAY, LLC; FULL THROTTLE FILMS, LLC; & VIDEO EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21517262 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2) (Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party D3 LED, LLC(pty:pla))(Gelhaar, Ned) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Video Equipment Rentals, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FULL THROTTLE FILMS LLC DBA VER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NED M. GELHAAR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teri T Pham