This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 08:07:41 (UTC).

CVS Pharmacy, Inc. v. Brink's U.S.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 CVS Pharmacy, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Brink's U S. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00660

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Defendant

Brink's U.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey S. Brenner

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Citizens Plaza, Suite 500, 454-1042, Fax: 454-1030

Providence, RI 02903

Robert J. Palmer

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

Two Lincoln Center, 5420 Lyndon B. Johnson Freeway, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75240-6215

Mark A. Goodman

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

Two Lincoln Center, 5420 Lyndon B. Johnson Freeway, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75240-6215

Defendant Attorneys

Edward A. Cohen

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

505 N 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Stephen M. Prignano

Attorney at McIntyre Tate LLP

321 South Main Street

Providence, RI 02903

Robert S. Parker

Attorney at McIntyre, Tate, Lynch, LLP

321 South Main Street, Suite 400, 351-7700, Fax: 331-6095

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION for Edward A. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1319345 ) filed by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc... (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Mark A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316383 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Robert J. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316380 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

8 #1

Memorandum in support

#8

TEXT ORDER entering #10 Stipulation to extend time to respond to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and III filed by Brink's U.S.; Response due by 2/25/2019.- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#6

No Description Available

#5

TEXT ORDER entering #5 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Brink's U.S. answer due 1/22/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/27/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Parker on behalf of Brink's U.S. (Parker, Robert) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Prignano on behalf of Brink's U.S. (Prignano, Stephen) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Brink's U.S. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

1 #2

Supporting Memorandum Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296815 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Memorandum Summons)(Brenner, Jeffrey) Docket Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Cohen. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/4/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Edward A. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1319345 ) filed by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc... (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entering #10 Stipulation to extend time to respond to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and III filed by Brink's U.S.; Response due by 2/25/2019.- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Goodman. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert J. Palmer. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Mark A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316383 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Robert J. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316380 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entering #5 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Brink's U.S. answer due 1/22/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/27/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION filed by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Parker on behalf of Brink's U.S. (Parker, Robert) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Prignano on behalf of Brink's U.S. (Prignano, Stephen) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Brink's U.S. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296815 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Memorandum Summons)(Brenner, Jeffrey) Docket Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Brink's U.S. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296815 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Memorandum Summons)(Brenner, Jeffrey) Docket Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less