This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2018 at 09:59:31 (UTC).

Culpepper v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 Culpepper filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Walter H Rice and Sharon L Ovington. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Walter H Rice

Referral Judge

Sharon L Ovington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamian Culpepper

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Barry Horenstein

Defendant Attorney

John J. Stark(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING IN THEIR ENTIRETY REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. # 18 ); JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT CAROLYN W. COLVIN, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURIT Y, REVERSING COMMISSIONER'S DECISION THAT PLAINTIFF WAS NOT DISABLED AND, THEREFORE, NOT ENTITLED TO BENEFITS UNDER THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT, AND REMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE TO THE DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER, PURSUANT TO THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. 405(g), FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/16/16. (kma)

#18

(#18) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Commissioner's non-disability finding be vacated; no finding be made as to whether Plaintiff Jamian Culpepper was under a "disability" within the meaning of the Social Security Act; this case be remande d to the Commissioner and the Administrative Law Judge under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for further consideration consistent with this Report; and the case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2016. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 7/29/2016. (lek)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING IN THEIR ENTIRETY REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. # 18 ); JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT CAROLYN W. COLVIN, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURIT Y, REVERSING COMMISSIONER'S DECISION THAT PLAINTIFF WAS NOT DISABLED AND, THEREFORE, NOT ENTITLED TO BENEFITS UNDER THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT, AND REMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE TO THE DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER, PURSUANT TO THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. 405(g), FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/16/16. (kma)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Commissioner's non-disability finding be vacated; no finding be made as to whether Plaintiff Jamian Culpepper was under a "disability" within the meaning of the Social Security Act; this case be remande d to the Commissioner and the Administrative Law Judge under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for further consideration consistent with this Report; and the case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2016. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 7/29/2016. (lek)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.