This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2019 at 08:14:24 (UTC).

Cuevas v. Kelly

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 Cuevas filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Kelly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jolie A. Russo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01973

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jolie A. Russo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Santos Cuevas

Salem, OR 97310-0505

Respondent

Brandon Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Lynn David Larsen

Attorney at State of Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court Street, Ne

Salem, OR 97301-4096

Kristen E. Boyd

Attorney at State of Oregon

1162 Court Street, Ne

Salem, OR 97301

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Memorandum Supporting Pre-Injunction. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (Related document(s): Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Preliminary Injunction #14 .) (joha) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#14

(#14) Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#12

(#12) Motion for DOJ to Show Cause. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (joha) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Boyd, Kristen) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#9

(#9) Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brandon Kelly. Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Larsen, Lynn) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

8 #2

Petition

8 #1

Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form

#8

(#8) Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 2/4/2019. Signed on 12/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha) (Copy of Scheduling Order and Consent Mailed to Petitioner.) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#7

(#7) Judicial Notice of Petitioners' Claims of Sentencing. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (joha) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#6

(#6) Clarification of Judicial Notice Filed by Santos Cuevas. (Related document(s): Notice #5 .) (dsg) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Judicial Notice Filed by Santos Cuevas. (kms) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that petitioner must sign and re-submit his Petition to the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return petitioners original Petition to petitioner, and upon receipt of the signed Petition back from petitioner, the Clerk of the Court is further DIRECTED to substitute the signed Petition in the Courts docket at ECF entry No. #1 . Signed on 11/19/18 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed order and original petition to petitioner) (dsg) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) Judicial Notice. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (joha) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#1

(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 80871 issued. Filed by Santos Cuevas against Brandon Kelly. (joha) Added Payment Information on 11/16/2018 (joha). (Main Document 1 replaced with signed petition per Order #4 on 11/30/2018) (joha). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Memorandum Supporting Pre-Injunction. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (Related document(s): Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Preliminary Injunction #14 .) (joha) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (dsg) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: The Court DENIES petitioner's "Motion for DOJ to Show Cause" #12 as the "Department of Justice" is not the respondent in this action and, in any event, pursuant to the Court's 12/4/2018, Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #8 , respondent's Answer and Response are not due until 2/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ps1) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Motion for DOJ to Show Cause. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (joha) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Boyd, Kristen) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brandon Kelly. Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Larsen, Lynn) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 2/4/2019. Signed on 12/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha) (Copy of Scheduling Order and Consent Mailed to Petitioner.) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Judicial Notice of Petitioners' Claims of Sentencing. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (joha) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Clarification of Judicial Notice Filed by Santos Cuevas. (Related document(s): Notice #5 .) (dsg) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judicial Notice Filed by Santos Cuevas. (kms) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that petitioner must sign and re-submit his Petition to the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return petitioners original Petition to petitioner, and upon receipt of the signed Petition back from petitioner, the Clerk of the Court is further DIRECTED to substitute the signed Petition in the Courts docket at ECF entry No. #1 . Signed on 11/19/18 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed order and original petition to petitioner) (dsg) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judicial Notice. Filed by Santos Cuevas. (joha) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 80871 issued. Filed by Santos Cuevas against Brandon Kelly. (joha) Added Payment Information on 11/16/2018 (joha). (Main Document 1 replaced with signed petition per Order #4 on 11/30/2018) (joha). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.