This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/25/2020 at 16:05:39 (UTC).

CTIA - The Wireless Ass'n v. City of Berkeley, et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CTIA - The Wireless Ass'n filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Berkeley,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-15141

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHRISTINE DANIEL, City Manager of Berkeley, California, in her official capacity

CITY OF BERKELEY, California

Plaintiff / Appellant

CTIA - THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION

Amicus Curiae

ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL ADVERTISERS, INC.

AMERICAN BEVERAGE ASSOCIATION

CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL

ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher David Jensen Esquire

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

2180 Milvia Street, 4Th Floor

Berkeley, CA 94704

Farimah Faiz Brown

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

2180 Milvia Street, 4Th Floor

Berkeley, CA 94704

Amanda Shanor

Attorney at Yale Law School

127 Wall Street

New Haven, CT 06511

Lester Lawrence Lessig Esquire III

Attorney at Harvard Law School

1563 Massachusetts Avenue

Cambridge, MA 02138

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joshua D. Dick

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joshua S. Lipshutz Esquire

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Helgi C. Walker

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Theodore B. Olson Esquire

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Robert Corn-Revere Esquire

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1919 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006-3401

Richard P. Bress

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Pratik A. Shah

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Claire Woods

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

111 Sutter Street, 21St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Selena Katherine Kyle

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

20 N. Wacker Drive, Suite # 1600

Chicago, IL 60606

R. Matthew Wise Esquire

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#147

#146

#145

#144

#143

142 #3

Post Judgment Form

142 #2

Webcite

142 #1

Opinion

#141

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Questionnaire

#1

Mediation Letter

117 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 19-439 Filed on: 09/30/2019 Cert Petition Action 1: Denied, 12/09/2019 [11527665] (RL) [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 19-439 Filed on: 09/30/2019 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [11452867] (RR) [Entered: 10/03/2019 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) MANDATE ISSUED.(WAF, MBC and MTF) Costs taxed against Appellant in the amount of $65.80. [11374644] (JFF) [Entered: 07/24/2019 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Berkeley bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 65.80 USD. Date of service: 07/16/2019 [11365601] [16-15141] (Jensen, Christopher) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Berkeley Correspondence: Regarding the opinion issued in this mater on July 2, 2019 - please add Christopher D. Jensen, Deputy City Attorney, Berkeley City Attorneys Office as an additional attorney in the listing of counsel for Defendants-Appellees.. Date of service: 07/02/2019 [11352215] [16-15141] (Brown, Farimah) [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) FILED OPINION (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, MORGAN B. CHRISTEN and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) AFFIRMED. Judge: WAF Authoring, Judge: MTF Dissenting. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [11351455]--[Edited: Attached corrected PDF of opinion (corrected typo). 07/02/2019 by SLM] (AKM) [Entered: 07/02/2019 07:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) Filed (ECF) Appellant CTIA - The Wireless Association citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/28/2019. [11210751] [16-15141] (Olson, Theodore) [Entered: 02/28/2019 07:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docket(#140) Added attorney Christopher David Jensen for Christine Daniel City of Berkeley. [11201632] (RL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docket(#139) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher D Jensen for Appellees City of Berkeley and Christine Daniel. Date of service: 02/20/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11201560] [16-15141] (Jensen, Christopher) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) Filed (ECF) Appellees City of Berkeley and Christine Daniel citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/20/2019. [11200802] [16-15141] (Brown, Farimah) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2016
  • Docket(#10) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Per counsel's request. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Zach Cowan for Appellees City of Berkeley and Christine Daniel. Date of service: 02/03/2016. [9852541] [16-15141] (Cowan, Zachary) [Entered: 02/03/2016 11:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Docket(#9) Added attorney Joshua D Dick for CTIA - The Wireless Association, in case 16-15141. [9851897] (RR) [Entered: 02/02/2016 06:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Docket(#8) Added attorney Helgi C. Walker for CTIA - The Wireless Association, in case 16-15141. [9851893] (RR) [Entered: 02/02/2016 05:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael R. Huston for Appellant CTIA - The Wireless Association. Date of service: 02/02/2016. [9851477] [16-15141] (Olson, Theodore) [Entered: 02/02/2016 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua D. Dick for Appellant CTIA - The Wireless Association. Date of service: 02/02/2016. [9851468] [16-15141] (Lipshutz, Joshua) [Entered: 02/02/2016 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua S. Lipshutz for Appellant CTIA - The Wireless Association. Date of service: 02/02/2016. [9851382] [16-15141] (Lipshutz, Joshua) [Entered: 02/02/2016 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Helgi C. Walker for Appellant CTIA - The Wireless Association. Date of service: 02/02/2016. [9851341] [16-15141] (Olson, Theodore) [Entered: 02/02/2016 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Theodore B. Olson for Appellant CTIA - The Wireless Association. Date of service: 02/02/2016. [9851332] [16-15141] (Olson, Theodore) [Entered: 02/02/2016 02:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SFI): The appeal filed February 1, 2016 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than February 29, 2016; the answering brief is due March 28, 2016 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [9850967] (TSP) [Entered: 02/02/2016 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/08/2016. [9849789] (RT) [Entered: 02/01/2016 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CTIA - THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Natural Resources Defense Council is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Claire Woods

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Corn-Revere