This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2018 at 07:02:42 (UTC).

Crytek GmbH v. Cloud Imperium Games Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 Crytek GmbH filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cloud Imperium Games Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-08937

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crytek GmbH

Defendants

Roberts Space Industries Corp

Cloud Imperium Games Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin James Minnick

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Young Pak

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

525 University Avenue Suite 1400

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Paramjeet Singh Sammi

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Kurt Wm Hemr

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy S Goldman

Attorney at Frankfurt Kurnit Klein and Selz PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 1060

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joseph R Taylor

Attorney at Frankfurt Kurnit Klein and Selz PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 1060

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Azita Iskandar

Attorney at Frankfurt Kurnit Klein and Selz PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 1060

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #19 filed by Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

#25

(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #19 filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Pak, James) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#24

(#24) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Azita Iskandar on behalf of Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp (Attorney Azita Iskandar added to party Cloud Imperium Games Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Azita Iskandar added to party Roberts Space Industries Corp(pty:dft))(Iskandar, Azita) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#23

(#23) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph R Taylor on behalf of Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp (Attorney Joseph R Taylor added to party Cloud Imperium Games Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph R Taylor added to party Roberts Space Industries Corp(pty:dft))(Taylor, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

19 #3

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

19 #2

Declaration DECLARATION OF JEREMY S. GOLDMAN

19 #1

Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION

#19

(#19) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANTS Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEREMY S. GOLDMAN, #3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Attorney Jeremy S Goldman added to party Cloud Imperium Games Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy S Goldman added to party Roberts Space Industries Corp(pty:dft)) (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

16 #1

Proposed Order

8 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH, (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#18) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pak, James) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or Claims for Relief Therein or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement and to Strike Certain Portions of the First Amended Complaint (FRCP 12(B)(6), 12(E) & 12(f)) #19 presently scheduled for hearing on February 9, 2018, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #19 filed by Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #19 filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Pak, James) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Azita Iskandar on behalf of Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp (Attorney Azita Iskandar added to party Cloud Imperium Games Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Azita Iskandar added to party Roberts Space Industries Corp(pty:dft))(Iskandar, Azita) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph R Taylor on behalf of Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp (Attorney Joseph R Taylor added to party Cloud Imperium Games Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph R Taylor added to party Roberts Space Industries Corp(pty:dft))(Taylor, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kurt Wm. Hemr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Crytek GmbH, designating Kevin J. Minnick as local counsel #16 . (gk) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp, (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice and Motion, #2 Exhibit B- Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Exhibit C- Declaration of Jeremy S. Goldman)(Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANTS Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR CLAIMS FOR RELIEF THEREIN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEREMY S. GOLDMAN, #3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Attorney Jeremy S Goldman added to party Cloud Imperium Games Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy S Goldman added to party Roberts Space Industries Corp(pty:dft)) (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Cloud Imperium Games Corp., Roberts Space Industries Corp amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pak, James) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paramjeet S. Sammi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Crytek GmbH (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20960487) filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) ( Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH, (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20960362 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Crytek GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Kevin James Minnick added to party Crytek GmbH(pty:pla))(Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Wm. Hemr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin James Minnick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Y. Pak