This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2018 at 07:23:29 (UTC).

CryptoCrane, LLC v. FedEx Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 CryptoCrane, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FedEx Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Steven Whalen and Robert H. Cleland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-12420

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

Presiding Judge

Robert H. Cleland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CryptoCrane, LLC

Defendants

FedEx Corporation

FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Norman C. Witte

Attorney at Witte Law Office

119 E. Kalamazoo Street

Lansing, MI 48933-2111

Defendant Attorney

Kevin J. Plagens

Attorney at Kopka, Pinkus, Dolin & Eads

33533 W. Twelve Mile Road, Suite 350

Farmington Hills, MI 48331

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 10/2/2018, Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (WBar) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Plagens on behalf of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Witte, Norman) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued for *FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.* (DWor) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

9 #10

Exhibit J

9 #9

Exhibit I

9 #8

Exhibit H

9 #7

Exhibit G

9 #6

Exhibit F

9 #5

Exhibit E

9 #4

Exhibit D

9 #3

Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) AMENDED #5 Summons Issued, #4 Complaint,, by CryptoCrane, LLC First Amended Complaint to change defendants name (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Witte, Norman) [DOCKET ERROR - WRONG EVENT USED - DOCUMENT IS AN AMENDED COMPLAINT] Modified on 8/23/2018 (NAhm). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

4 #10

Exhibit J

4 #9

Exhibit I

4 #8

Exhibit H

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 10/2/2018, Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (WBar) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Plagens on behalf of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Witte, Norman) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Issued for *FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.* (DWor) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Reason: Parties were omitted and incorrectly added to CM/ECF when e-filing #9 Amended Document, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Witte, Norman) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED #5 Summons Issued, #4 Complaint,, by CryptoCrane, LLC First Amended Complaint to change defendants name (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Witte, Norman) [DOCKET ERROR - WRONG EVENT USED - DOCUMENT IS AN AMENDED COMPLAINT] Modified on 8/23/2018 (NAhm). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Vacating #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CryptoCrane, LLC. (Witte, Norman) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for CryptoCrane, LLC to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2018 Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued for *FedEx Corporation* (SKra) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT filed by CryptoCrane, LLC against CryptoCrane, LLC with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Witte, Norman)[FEE PAID IN ENTRY #1 ; RECEIPT NO. 0645-6846445] Modified on 8/8/2018 (DPer). (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER striking #1 Complaint and ordering plaintiff to comply with formatting rules. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *FedEx Corporation* (NAhm) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) [STRICKEN PER 08/07/18 ORDER] COMPLAINT filed by CryptoCrane, LLC against FedEx Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6846445 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sale Notifications, #2 Exhibit B - Fedex Proof of Delivery, #3 Exhibit C - Call from Lisa Gemuend, #4 Exhibit D - FedEx Claim No 1220825712, #5 Exhibit E - Text messages, #6 Exhibit F - Email exchange, #7 Exhibit G - Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit H - Email from Dr. Mai, #9 Exhibit I - Screenshot, #10 Exhibit J - Email exchange) (Witte, Norman) Modified on 8/7/2018 (DPer). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Plagens