This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:42:35 (UTC).

Cryar v. Tenneco Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 Cryar filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Tenneco Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01052

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Cryar

Defendants

Dennis J. Letham

James S. Metcalf

Brian J. Kesseler

Roger B. Porter

David B. Price, Jr.

Jane L. Warner

Gregg M. Sherrill

Thomas C. Freyman

Paul T. Stecko

Tenneco Inc.

Roger J. Wood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blake A. Bennett

Attorney at Cooch and Taylor

The Brandywine Building, 1000 N. West Street, 10Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Travis Steven Hunter

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SO ORDERED Granting #16 Stipulation and Order Concerning Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal of This Action (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/4/2018. (nms) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Concerning Voluntary Dismissal of This Action, by Joseph Cryar. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nms). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yosef J. Riemer - filed by Thomas C. Freyman, Brian J. Kesseler, Dennis J. Letham, James S. Metcalf, Roger B. Porter, David B. Price, Jr, Gregg M. Sherrill, Paul T. Stecko, Tenneco Inc., Jane L. Warner, Roger J. Wood. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Thomas C. Freyman served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Dennis J. Letham served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. James S. Metcalf served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#10

No Description Available

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Roger B. Porter served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Roger J. Wood served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Jane L. Warner served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Gregg M. Sherrill served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Brian J. Kesseler served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Tenneco Inc. served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certificate of Plaintiff

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Thomas C. Freyman, Brian J. Kesseler, Dennis J. Letham, James S. Metcalf, Roger B. Porter, David B. Price, Jr, Gregg M. Sherrill, Paul T. Stecko, Tenneco Inc., Jane L. Warner, Roger J. Wood - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2420421.) - filed by Joseph Cryar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SO ORDERED Granting #16 Stipulation and Order Concerning Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal of This Action (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/4/2018. (nms) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Concerning Voluntary Dismissal of This Action, by Joseph Cryar. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nms). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yosef J. Riemer, filed by James S. Metcalf, Dennis J. Letham, Jane L. Warner, Roger B. Porter, Gregg M. Sherrill, Tenneco Inc., Roger J. Wood, Paul T. Stecko, Brian J. Kesseler, David B. Price, Jr., Thomas C. Freyman. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/28/2018. (nms) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yosef J. Riemer - filed by Thomas C. Freyman, Brian J. Kesseler, Dennis J. Letham, James S. Metcalf, Roger B. Porter, David B. Price, Jr, Gregg M. Sherrill, Paul T. Stecko, Tenneco Inc., Jane L. Warner, Roger J. Wood. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to September 6, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Thomas C. Freyman answer due 9/6/2018; Brian J. Kesseler answer due 9/6/2018; Dennis J. Letham answer due 9/6/2018; James S. Metcalf answer due 9/6/2018; Roger B. Porter answer due 9/6/2018; David B. Price, Jr answer due 9/6/2018; Gregg M. Sherrill answer due 9/6/2018; Paul T. Stecko answer due 9/6/2018; Tenneco Inc. answer due 9/6/2018; Jane L. Warner answer due 9/6/2018; Roger J. Wood answer due 9/6/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2018. (nms) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to September 6, 2018 - filed by Thomas C. Freyman, Brian J. Kesseler, Dennis J. Letham, James S. Metcalf, Roger B. Porter, David B. Price, Jr, Gregg M. Sherrill, Paul T. Stecko, Tenneco Inc., Jane L. Warner, Roger J. Wood. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Thomas C. Freyman served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Dennis J. Letham served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. James S. Metcalf served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. David B. Price, Jr served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Roger B. Porter served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Roger J. Wood served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Jane L. Warner served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Gregg M. Sherrill served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Brian J. Kesseler served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cryar. Tenneco Inc. served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Thomas C. Freyman on 7/17/2018; Brian J. Kesseler on 7/17/2018; Dennis J. Letham on 7/17/2018; James S. Metcalf on 7/17/2018; Roger B. Porter on 7/17/2018; David B. Price, Jr on 7/17/2018; Gregg M. Sherrill on 7/17/2018; Paul T. Stecko on 7/17/2018; Tenneco Inc. on 7/17/2018; Jane L. Warner on 7/17/2018; Roger J. Wood on 7/17/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Thomas C. Freyman, Brian J. Kesseler, Dennis J. Letham, James S. Metcalf, Roger B. Porter, David B. Price, Jr, Gregg M. Sherrill, Paul T. Stecko, Tenneco Inc., Jane L. Warner, Roger J. Wood - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2420421.) - filed by Joseph Cryar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.