This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2018 at 09:02:16 (UTC).

CRX Tech, LLC v. Lite-On, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 CRX Tech, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lite-On, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-00734

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRX Tech, LLC

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Lite-On, Inc.

Lite-On Technology Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin T Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacob Buczko

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Timothy T. Hsieh

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Richard C Vasquez

Attorney at Vasquez Benisek & Lindgren, LLP

3685 Mt. Diablo Blvd, Suite 300

Lafayette, CA 94549

Christopher L. Larson

Attorney at Vasquez Benisek & Lindgren, LLP

3685 Mt. Diablo Blvd, Suite 300

Lafayette, CA 94549

Jeffrey T Lindgren

Attorney at Vasquez Benisek & Lindgren, LLP

3685 Mt. Diablo Blvd, Suite 300

Lafayette, CA 94549

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Lite-On, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#21

(#21) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lite-On, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lite-On Technology Corporation, Corporate Parent Lite-On Technology USA, Inc. for Lite-On, Inc., Lite-On, Inc.. (Vasquez, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#20

(#20) Defendant Lite-On, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM To Plaintiff CRX Tech, LLC's Complaint For Patent Infringement against Lite-On, Inc. by Lite-On, Inc..(Vasquez, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of CRX Tech, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy T. Hsieh on behalf of CRX Tech, LLC (Hsieh, Timothy) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Buczko on behalf of CRX Tech, LLC (Buczko, Jacob) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by CRX Tech, LLC re #1 Complaint of Related Case (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRX Tech, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#20) Defendant Lite-On, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM To Plaintiff CRX Tech, LLC's Complaint For Patent Infringement against Lite-On, Inc. by Lite-On, Inc..(Vasquez, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Lite-On, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lite-On, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lite-On Technology Corporation, Corporate Parent Lite-On Technology USA, Inc. for Lite-On, Inc., Lite-On, Inc.. (Vasquez, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Defendant Lite-On, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM To Plaintiff CRX Tech, LLC's Complaint For Patent Infringement against Lite-On, Inc. by Lite-On, Inc..(Vasquez, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lite-On, Inc. to 1/18/2018. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lite-On, Inc..( Vasquez, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 12,13,14, Notice of Attorney Appearnace. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) Modified on 12/4/2017 (ch, ). (RE-FILED AT 16,17,18) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lite-On, Inc. to 1/8/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher L. Larson on behalf of Lite-On, Inc. (Larson, Christopher) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Lindgren on behalf of Lite-On, Inc. (Lindgren, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of CRX Tech, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy T. Hsieh on behalf of CRX Tech, LLC (Hsieh, Timothy) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Buczko on behalf of CRX Tech, LLC (Buczko, Jacob) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Wang on behalf of CRX Tech, LLC (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by CRX Tech, LLC re #1 Complaint of Related Case (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRX Tech, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6545532.), filed by CRX Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lite-On Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy T. Hsieh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Robert Buczko