This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2018 at 07:10:32 (UTC).

Crumrine v. Snohomish County et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 Crumrine filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Snohomish County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01155

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy Crumrine

Defendants

Snohomish County

Snohomish County Corrections Bureau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicole K. Young

Attorney at PREMIER LAW GROUP

1408 140Th Place Ne

Bellevue, WA 98007

Patrick J Kang

Attorney at PREMIER LAW GROUP

1408 140Th Place Ne

Bellevue, WA 98007

Defendant Attorney

Douglas John Morrill

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FEDERAL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE, AND TO REMAND BACK TO STATE COURT by parties (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/19/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney Douglas John Morrill added to party Snohomish County Corrections Bureau(pty:dft) by Snohomish County, Snohomish County Corrections Bureau.(Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#5

(#5) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

4 #4

Summons

4 #3

Cover Sheet

4 #2

Case Schedule

4 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Snohomish County (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Case Schedule, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal to King County Superior Court and to Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Defendant Snohomish County (Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Snohomish County. (Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

1 #4

Case Information Sheet

1 #3

Case Schedule

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-17677-8; (Receipt # 0981-5425302), filed by Snohomish County. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Case Schedule, #4 Case Information Sheet)(Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FEDERAL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE, AND TO REMAND BACK TO STATE COURT by parties (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/19/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney Douglas John Morrill added to party Snohomish County Corrections Bureau(pty:dft) by Snohomish County, Snohomish County Corrections Bureau.(Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Randy Crumrine (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (DJ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Snohomish County (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Case Schedule, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal to King County Superior Court and to Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Defendant Snohomish County (Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Snohomish County. (Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-17677-8; (Receipt # 0981-5425302), filed by Snohomish County. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Case Schedule, #4 Case Information Sheet)(Morrill, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Snohomish County Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J Kang