This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:21:33 (UTC).

Robertson v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 Robertson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry L Wooten and Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01842

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Terry L Wooten

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul E Cruise

Defendants

Armstrong International Inc

Schneider Electric USA Inc

Occidental Chemical Corporation

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Gardner Denver Inc

Trane US Inc

Fluor Enterprises Inc

Fluor Constructors International

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Southwire Company LLC

Warren Pumps LLC

Covil Corporation

Daniel International Corporation

API Heat Transfer Inc

IMO Industries Inc

Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable

General Electric Company

Ecodyne Corporation

Carrier Corporation

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Theile Branham McVey

Attorney at John D Kassel Law Firm

Po Box 1476

Columbia, SC 29202

Jonathan Marshall Holder

Attorney at Dean Omar Branham Shirely LLP

302 N Market Street, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Hedderman Wall

Attorney at Elmore and Wall

Po Box 1200

Charleston, SC 29402

Jennifer Ann Jordan

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 1806

Charleston, SC 29402

Robert O Meriwether

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

David Gaillard Traylor, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

Mary Skahan Willis

Attorney at Ethridge Law Group LLC

1100 Queensborough Boulevard, Suite 200

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Stephen L Brown

Attorney at Young Clement Rivers and Tisdale

Po Box 993

Charleston, SC 29402

William Ansel Collins, Jr

Attorney at Dougall and Collins

1700 Woodcreek Farms Road, Suite 100

Elgin, SC 29045

Michal Kalwajtys

Attorney at Dougall and Collins

1700 Woodcreek Farms Road, Suite 100

Elgin, SC 29045

Other Attorneys

Christopher Austin Jaros

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (Chas)

134 Meeting Street, Suite 500

Charleston, SC 29401

Tara Cloer Sullivan

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (Chas)

134 Meeting Street, Suite 500

Charleston, SC 29401

Robert Erving Stepp

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

A Victor Rawl, Jr

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Timothy William Bouch

Attorney at Bouch McLeod LLC

Po Box 59

Charleston, SC 29402

Rachel M Hutchens

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Joseph E Thoensen

Attorney at Richardson Plowden and Robinson (Cola)

Po Drawer 7788

Columbia, SC 29202

William P Early

Attorney at Pierce Herns Sloan and McLeod

Po Box 22437

Charleston, SC 29413

Yancey Alford McLeod, III

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

5 Exchange Street, Po Box 999

Charleston, SC 29402

Joshua Wallace Dixon

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#366

#365

339 #7

Ex G - GE Letter from EWH to Plaintiff Counsel re document production 9-24-2019

339 #6

Ex F - Ray Watson 6-5-19 Excerpts

339 #5

Ex E - GE Objections to Plaintiff Notice of Deposition 30b6 (plastics witness)

339 #4

Ex D - GE 1975 Buylog

339 #3

Ex C - Plaintiff Notice of Deposition 30b6 of GE - Amended for 12-11-2019

339 #2

Ex B - GE Objections to Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition 30b6 served 10-23-19

339 #1

Ex A - Plaintiff Notice of Deposition 30b6 of GE for 11-6-19

1 #10

Exhibit E, State Court documents

1 #9

Exhibit D, Part 2

1 #8

Exhibit D, Part 1

1 #7

Exhibit C, Part 4

1 #5

Exhibit C, Part 3A

1 #4

Exhibit C, Part 2

1 #3

Exhibit C, Part 1

1 #2

Exhibit B, Pantaleoni Affidavit

1 #1

Exhibit A

464 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#366) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#365) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Spirax Sarco Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#363) Withdrawal of Motions: #339 MOTION for Protective Order filed by General Electric Company.. (Techman, Jennifer) (Main Document 363 replaced on 2/5/2020 to correct case number on document as verified by filing user) (lgib, ). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#362) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#361) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of CBS Corporation (Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#360) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#359) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#358) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#357) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service of Expert Reports by Jennifer M Techman on behalf of Trane US Inc (Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#356) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Service by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc (Meriwether, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
322 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay Discovery and, in the Alternative, MOTION for a More Definite Statement and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fisher Controls International LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit)No proposed order.(Bouch, Timothy). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION for More Definite Statement,MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 7/12/2018 (asni, ). (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay Discovery and,in the Alternative, MOTION for a More Definite Statement and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Crosby Valve LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit)No proposed order.(Bouch, Timothy). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION for More Definite Statement,MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 7/12/2018 (asni, ). (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Marmon Engineered Wire & Cable (TE Wire & Cable LLC, originally filed in state court 7/5/2018).(asni, ) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Ecodyne Corporation. (originally filed in state court on 7/5/2018)(asni, ) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G Tate, Jr on behalf of Southwire Company LLC (Tate, Ronald) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Bowman White on behalf of Southwire Company LLC (White, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Rebecca Twilley on behalf of Southwire Company LLC (Twilley, Allyson) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co.(kbos) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas Richland County, case number 2018-CP-40-2849. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7870365), filed by Crane Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Pantaleoni Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C, Part 1, #4 Exhibit C, Part 2, #5 Exhibit C, Part 3A, #6 Exhibit C, Part 3B, #7 Exhibit C, Part 4, #8 Exhibit D, Part 1, #9 Exhibit D, Part 2, #10 Exhibit E, State Court documents)(kbos) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where API Heat Transfer Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Ecodyne Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Southwire Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIL CORPORATION is a litigant