This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 08:20:45 (UTC).

Crowther v. Wright Medical Technology et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 Crowther filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul M. Warner, Brooke C. Wells and David Nuffer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brooke C. Wells

Presiding Judges

Paul M. Warner

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travis Crowther

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology

Wright Medical Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas B. Cannon

Attorney at FABIAN VANCOTT

215 S State St Ste 1200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2323

Defendant Attorneys

Elisabeth M. McOmber

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

J. Scott Kramer

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

30 S 17Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19103-1104

Danielle N. Bagwell

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

30 S 17Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Travis Crowther. (Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

23 #1

Exhibit A - Jorgensen v. Wright Medical Decision

#23

(#23) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jorgensen v. Wright Medical Decision)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#21

(#21) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Certain Clams MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages Demand (Hearing Requested) filed by Plaintiff Travis Crowther. (Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

18 #3

Text of Proposed Order re PHV Admission D Bagwell

18 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Form D Bagwell

18 #1

Exhibit A - Application PHV D Bagwell

#18

(#18) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle N. Bagwell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3137787, filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application PHV D Bagwell, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form D Bagwell, #3 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Admission D Bagwell)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

17 #1

Exhibit A - Application for PHV Admission S. Kramer

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Scott Kramer and Danielle N. Bagwell, for Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology identifying Wright Medical Group, N.V. as Corporate Parent. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Travis Crowther, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. Form due by 10/15/2018. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Travis Crowther, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Seet

2 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket

2 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint_Defs POS_Summons_Complaints

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court - Ogden, Weber County, case number 180905289, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3113827) filed by Wright Medical Technology, Wright Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint_Defs POS_Summons_Complaints, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Seet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Travis Crowther. (Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jorgensen v. Wright Medical Decision)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Motions No Longer Referred: #10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Certain Clams MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages Demand (mjw) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Certain Clams MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages Demand (Hearing Requested) filed by Plaintiff Travis Crowther. (Cannon, Douglas) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle N. Bagwell for Wright Medical Technology. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/2/2018. No attached document. (mas) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Scott Kramer for Wright Medical Technology. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/2/2018. No attached document. (mas) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle N. Bagwell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3137787, filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application PHV D Bagwell, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form D Bagwell, #3 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Admission D Bagwell)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Scott Kramer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3137756, filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for PHV Admission S. Kramer, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form S. Kramer, #3 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Admission of S. Kramer)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • (#16) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motion referred to Brooke C. Wells. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 10/30/18 (docket text only - no attached document)(alt) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • (#15) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Certain Clams, MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages Demand filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (McOmber, Elisabeth) Modified on 10/30/2018: corrected text (alt) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Wright Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of D. Daurer)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Travis Crowther. (las) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/1/2018. (las) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Scott Kramer and Danielle N. Bagwell, for Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology identifying Wright Medical Group, N.V. as Corporate Parent. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Travis Crowther, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. Form due by 10/15/2018. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Travis Crowther, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court - Ogden, Weber County, case number 180905289, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3113827) filed by Wright Medical Technology, Wright Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint_Defs POS_Summons_Complaints, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Seet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas B. Cannon