This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:44:25 (UTC).

Crowe v. Esper

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Crowe filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Esper. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KEVIN S.C. CHANG and ALAN C. KAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00288

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KEVIN S.C. CHANG

Presiding Judge

ALAN C. KAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven W. Crowe

Defendant

Dr. Mark T. Esper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elbridge Z. Smith

Attorney at Smith Himmelmann AAL ALC

745 Fort Street, Ste. 311, 523-5050, Fax: 538-1382

Honolulu, HI 96813

Elbridge W. Smith

Attorney at SMITH HIMMELMANN AAL ALC

745 Fort St Ste 311, 523-5050, Fax: 538-1382

Honolulu, HI 96813-3803

 

Court Documents

6 #2

AO 399 form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (afc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#4

(#4) CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#6

(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark T. Esper, filed by Steven W. Crowe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Smith, Elbridge) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

1 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/24/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/27/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/27/2018)

6 #1

AO 398 form

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • (#8) EO: Pursuant to Elbridge Smith's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 10/30/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/23/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0975-2066691 re #1 Complaint. (afc) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (afc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/24/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/27/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE ALAN C. KAY and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00288-ACK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mark T. Esper, filed by Steven W. Crowe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Smith, Elbridge) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.