This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2018 at 06:13:41 (UTC).

Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. v. OSF Health Care System et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 Crothall Laundry Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OSF Health Care System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James E. Shadid and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01145

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.

Defendants

OSF Healthcare System

Denman Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy Paul Kreger

Attorney at Stahl Cowen Crowley Addis LLC

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Jon David Cohen

Attorney at STAHL COWEN CROWLEY ADDIS LLC

Suite 1200, 55 W Monroe

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Barry Francis MacEntee

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601-1081

Delmer R Mitchell

Attorney at SCHMIEDESKAMP ROBERTSON NEU & MITCHELL

Po Box 1069

Quincy, IL 62306

 

Court Documents

46 #1

*Restricted*

#46

(#46) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-08928. . (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#45

(#45) TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (las, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#44

(#44) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/6/2018.Mailed notice(las, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#43

(#43) ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' motion to transfer #14 to the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk's Office is directed to transfer this case to the Central District of Illinois forthwith. Status hearing set for 4/12/18 is stricken. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order.Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/6/2018. Mailed notice(las, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#42

(#42) SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. to reply #34 of OSF Regarding Motion to Transfer (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

34 #1

Exhibit A (Plaintiff's disclosures)

#34

(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to reply #34 (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

#14

(#43) ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' motion to transfer #14 to the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk's Office is directed to transfer this case to the Central District of Illinois forthwith. Status hearing set for 4/12/18 is stricken. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order.Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/6/2018. Mailed notice(las, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. regarding Summons served on Denman Services, Inc. on December 20, 2017 (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. regarding Summons served on OSF Healthcare System on December 22, 2017 (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. by Jon D Cohen (Cohen, Jon) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Initial status hearing set for 1/23/18 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. Parties shall refer to Judge St. Eve's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a Rule 26(f) Initial Status Report by 1/18/18 as set forth in the Rule 26(f) Report procedure. If the defendant has not been served as of 1/18/18, the Court will continue the filing date for the Rule 26(f) Report until the defendant is served. Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. by Jeremy Paul Kreger (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13900902. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-08928. . (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (las, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/6/2018.Mailed notice(las, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' motion to transfer #14 to the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk's Office is directed to transfer this case to the Central District of Illinois forthwith. Status hearing set for 4/12/18 is stricken. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order.Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/6/2018. Mailed notice(las, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. to reply #34 of OSF Regarding Motion to Transfer (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend deadline to file sur-reply until 3/30/18 #39 is granted. No appearance is required on the 4/4/18 notice of motion date. Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE of Motion by Jeremy Paul Kreger for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #39 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/4/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to reply #34 (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to strike portions of Defendant OSF's reply brief and grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a sur-reply in opposition to Defendant OSF's motion to transfer venue. #36 The Court directs Plaintiff to file a sur-reply, limited to four pages, to address the witness list included in Defendant OSF's reply brief. Plaintiff must file this sur-reply by 3/28/18. No appearance is required on the 3/27/18 notice of motion date. Status hearing set for 3/27/18 is stricken and reset to 4/12/18 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of Motion by Jeremy Paul Kreger for presentment of motion to strike #36 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/27/2018 at 01:30 PM. (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of Appearance by Denman Services, Inc. (Penn, David) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant OSF Health Care System by Barry Francis MacEntee (MacEntee, Barry) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. regarding Summons served on Denman Services, Inc. on December 20, 2017 (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. regarding Summons served on OSF Healthcare System on December 22, 2017 (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Denman Services, Inc., OSF Health Care System (pg, ) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. by Jon D Cohen (Cohen, Jon) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Initial status hearing set for 1/23/18 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. Parties shall refer to Judge St. Eve's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a Rule 26(f) Initial Status Report by 1/18/18 as set forth in the Rule 26(f) Report procedure. If the defendant has not been served as of 1/18/18, the Court will continue the filing date for the Rule 26(f) Report until the defendant is served. Mailed notice (kef, ) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. by Jeremy Paul Kreger (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13900902. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less