This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 07:54:39 (UTC).

Cross v. United States Marshal Service et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Cross filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Marshal Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald A. White and Dale A. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00327

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ronald A. White

Dale A. Kimball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adrian Cross

Panama, OK 74951

Defendants

David Anderson

David L. Harlow

Lloyd Vellek

United States Marshal Service

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Adrian Cross (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against David Anderson, David L. Harlow, United States Marshal Service, Lloyd Vellek by Adrian Cross (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Adrian Cross. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Adrian Cross. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

2 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Adrian Cross

2 #1

Exhibit A - Claim for Damage, Injury or Death

2 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Adrian Cross

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Dale A. Kimball of the District of Utah, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-327-DAK (tls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/28/2018 to edit text; NEF regenerated (tls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Adrian Cross. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Adrian Cross. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against David Anderson, David L. Harlow, United States Marshal Service, Lloyd Vellek by Adrian Cross (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Adrian Cross (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.