Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 19:16:27 (UTC).

Cross Border Resources, Inc v. KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2013 Cross Border Resources, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge A Solis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-CV-02491

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge A Solis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cross Border Resources Inc

Defendant and Counter Claimant

KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lacy M Lawrence

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2300 N. Field Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Marty L Brimmage, Jr

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2300 N. Field Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Martin J Lehman

Attorney at Palmer Lehman Sandberg, PLLC

8350 North Central Expwy, Suite 1111

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Michael L Davitt

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood St

Dallas, TX 75266-0623

Geoffrey Ritts

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Mark Waldemar Rasmussen

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Jennifer Rebecca Turner

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Deborah G Hankinson

Attorney at Hankinson LLP

750 N St Paul, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#58

(#58) 30-day Order of Dismissal. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 8/28/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

#57

(#57) Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Martin J. Lehman; Lacy M. Lawrence; Mark W. Rasmussen; Geoffrey J. Ritts. Prv Fee: $ $6,000.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Hankinson, Deborah) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

#56

(#56) CROSS BORDER RESOURCES, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO #49 KEYBANC CAPITAL MARKETS, INC.'S DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION EXCERPTS filed by Cross Border Resources Inc. Submitted pursuant to TXND Emergency Filing procedures. Email from filer received on 8/25/14 at 10:30pm. (ndt) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

#55

(#55) OBJECTION filed by Cross Border Resources Inc re: #48 Witness List (Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#54

(#54) OBJECTION filed by Cross Border Resources Inc re: #47 Exhibit List (Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#53

(#53) MEDIATION ORDER. The Court has determined that this case is appropriate for mediation. The parties are ORDERED to attend mediation on August 26, at 10:00 a.m., before the parties' chosen mediator Jude Deborah Hankinson. If the parties' attempts to resolve this case remain unsuccessful, then a bench trial will begin on September 2, 2014. The costs of mediation are to be divided and borne equally by the parties unless agreed otherwise. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/26/2014. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 8/25/2014) (ndt) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#49

(#49) Designation of Deposition by KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc. (Rasmussen, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

#48

(#55) OBJECTION filed by Cross Border Resources Inc re: #48 Witness List (Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#47

(#54) OBJECTION filed by Cross Border Resources Inc re: #47 Exhibit List (Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

6 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#6

(#9) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Cross Border Resources Inc. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim(Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 07/25/2013)

#5

(#5) Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan enters his recusal. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned. (gr) (Entered: 07/01/2013)

#4

(#4) Supplemental Document by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc. as to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for Cases Removed from State Court. (Davitt, Michael) Modified on 7/1/2013 (clf). (Entered: 06/28/2013)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Solis. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 06/28/2013)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc.. (Davitt, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A through D

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) Supplemental Document by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc. as to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for Cases Removed from State Court. (Davitt, Michael) Modified on 7/1/2013 (clf). (Entered: 06/28/2013)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) 30-day Order of Dismissal. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 8/28/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Martin J. Lehman; Lacy M. Lawrence; Mark W. Rasmussen; Geoffrey J. Ritts. Prv Fee: $ $6,000.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Hankinson, Deborah) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) CROSS BORDER RESOURCES, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO #49 KEYBANC CAPITAL MARKETS, INC.'S DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION EXCERPTS filed by Cross Border Resources Inc. Submitted pursuant to TXND Emergency Filing procedures. Email from filer received on 8/25/14 at 10:30pm. (ndt) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) OBJECTION filed by Cross Border Resources Inc re: #48 Witness List (Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) OBJECTION filed by Cross Border Resources Inc re: #47 Exhibit List (Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MEDIATION ORDER. The Court has determined that this case is appropriate for mediation. The parties are ORDERED to attend mediation on August 26, at 10:00 a.m., before the parties' chosen mediator Jude Deborah Hankinson. If the parties' attempts to resolve this case remain unsuccessful, then a bench trial will begin on September 2, 2014. The costs of mediation are to be divided and borne equally by the parties unless agreed otherwise. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/26/2014. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 8/25/2014) (ndt) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE of No Objecton to Cross Border's Exhibit List, Witness List and Deposition Designations filed by KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc (Rasmussen, Mark) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Docket(#51) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jorge A Solis: Pretrial Conference held on 8/22/2014. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Marty Brimmage, Martin Lehman; Defense - Mark Rasmussen, Geoffrey Ritts. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :20. (chmb) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marty L Brimmage, Jr, Lacy M Lawrence on behalf of Cross Border Resources Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Brimmage, Marty) Modified attorney on 8/22/2014 (jrr). (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Designation of Deposition by KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc. (Rasmussen, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cross Border Resources Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Red Mountain Resources, Inc. for Cross Border Resources Inc, Cross Border Resources Inc. (Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 08/06/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Cross Border Resources Inc. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim(Lehman, Martin) (Entered: 07/25/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Rebecca Turner on behalf of KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Turner, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/8/2013. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 7/8/2013) (axm) (Entered: 07/08/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Original ANSWER to Complaint filed by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Cross Border Resources, Inc filed by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Davitt, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan enters his recusal. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned. (gr) (Entered: 07/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Supplemental Document by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc. as to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for Cases Removed from State Court. (Davitt, Michael) Modified on 7/1/2013 (clf). (Entered: 06/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Solis. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 06/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc.. (Davitt, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 44th-B Judicial District Court of Dallas County, case number DC-13-06410-B filed by KeyBanc Capital Markets, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-5396370) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A through D) (Davitt, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEYBANC CAPITAL MARKETS INC. is a litigant