This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2018 at 07:51:44 (UTC).

Crockett et al v. NEA-Alaska et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Crockett filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against NEA-Alaska. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00179

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Nees

Dolores McKee

Donn Liston

Carol Carman

Tracy Crockett

Kathryn McCollum

Defendants

Matthew McSorley

Lon Needles

Jean M. Ward

Mantanuska-Susitna Borough School District

Matanuska-Susitna Education Association

National Educaton Association

NEA-Alaska

Mila Cosgrove

Tyler E. Andrews

Lee Holen

National Education Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John B. Thorsness

Attorney at Clapp, Peterson, Tiemessen, Thorsness & Johnson, LLC (Anch)

711 H. Street, Suite 620

Anchorage, AK 99501-3454

Defendant Attorneys

Saul R. Friedman

Attorney at Jermain Dunnagan & Owens, P.C.

3000 A. Street, Suite 300

Anchorage, AK 99503

Sarah E. Josephson

Attorney at Jermain Dunnagan & Owens, P.C.

3000 A. Street, Suite 300

Anchorage, AK 99503

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Josephson on behalf of Mantanuska-Susitna Borough School District (Josephson, Sarah) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mantanuska-Susitna Borough School District. Mantanuska-Susitna Borough School District waiver sent on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Friedman, Saul) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Saul R. Friedman on behalf of Mantanuska-Susitna Borough School District (Friedman, Saul) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Thorsness, John) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2558322.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Thorsness, John) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah E. Josephson