This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2019 at 07:06:02 (UTC).

Creative Impact Inc. et al v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 Creative Impact Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07531

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zuru LLC

Zuru Inc.

Creative Impact Inc.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

LangShacompany

Geeker

Anyang Feeker Trading Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

55 E. Monroe St., Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorney

Adam Edward Urbanczyk

Attorney at AU LLC

564 W. Randolph St. 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF DEFENDANTS DOE NOS. 5 AND 124 (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#31

(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#30

(#30) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #28 is granted. Motion hearing held on 12/21/2018. The $10,000 bond posted by Plaintiffs shall remain with the Court until a Final disposition of this case or until this Preliminary Injunction is terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/21/2018:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas Allen Kurtz for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #28 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/21/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

28 #2

Declaration

28 #1

Memorandum

#28

(#28) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Doe Nos. 109 and 121 (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC to seal document Schedule A attached to the Complaint and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jessica Arnaiz (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC by Nicholas Allen Kurtz (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15176110.(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (pj, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF DEFENDANTS DOE NOS. 5 AND 124 (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #28 is granted. Motion hearing held on 12/21/2018. The $10,000 bond posted by Plaintiffs shall remain with the Court until a Final disposition of this case or until this Preliminary Injunction is terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/21/2018:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas Allen Kurtz for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #28 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/21/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Doe Nos. 109 and 121 (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SECOND Extension of Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs' second motion to extend temporary restraining order #24 is granted. Motion hearing held on 12/17/2018. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/17/2018:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas Allen Kurtz for presentment of extension of time #24 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/17/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Nicholas A. Kurtz, #4 Declaration Jens Schott Knudsen, #5 Declaration Jessica Arnaiz, #6 Exhibit Arnaiz Declaration - Ex 1-A - Redacted, #7 Exhibit Arnaiz Declaration - Ex 1-B - Redacted, #8 Exhibit Arnaiz Declaration - Ex 1-C - Redacted, #9 Exhibit Arnaiz Declaration - Ex 1-D - Redacted, #10 Exhibit Arnaiz Declaration - Ex 1-E - Redacted)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC to seal document Schedule A attached to the Complaint and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jessica Arnaiz (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC Schedule A to Complaint (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC by Nicholas Allen Kurtz (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15176110.(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creative Impact Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto is a litigant

Latest cases where Zuru Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam E Urbanczyk