This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 07:04:59 (UTC).

Crawford v. Obaisi et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 Crawford filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Obaisi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmond E. Chang and Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01597

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Edmond E. Chang

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crawford

DeAndre Crawford

Defendants

Obaisi

Sangatay Garg

Dr. Brooks

D. Walker

Alisha Shivers

Jacquline Mitchell

Mrs. Alveraz

Ghaliah Obaisi, Independent Executor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi

Wexford Health Source Inc

K. Rabideau

Anna McBee

Lt. Wright

Major Lake

Sgt. Butler

Salahi Obaisi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Josephine Tung

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

191 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

David Michael Friebus

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606-2841

Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

71 S. Wacker Dr., 16Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Randall Burgett

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

20 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60606

Joseph Jack Lombardo

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

222 West Adams Street, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60606

Miguel E. Larios

Attorney at Peterson, Johnson & Murray Chicago, LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2125

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew H Weller

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

222 West Adams Street, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60606-2903

Colleen Marie Shannon

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Summer Muazaz Hallaj

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Megan Marie Honingford

Attorney at Illinois Office Of The Attorney General

100 W. Randolph, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeanne N. Brown

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Thor Yukinobu Inouye

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General's Office

100 W. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#217

#216

#215

#214

#213

#212

#211

#210

#192

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

256 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#217) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 12/20/2019. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#216) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the Order, the Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/20/2019. (See Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details.)Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#215) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of the parties' joint status report #214 , the Court does not see a need for a reassignment status. The Court will set a status following a ruling on motion for summary judgment. Status set for 9/17/19 is stricken. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#214) STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by Service List (Lombardo, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#213) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Mary M. Rowland. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, all previously-set discovery, briefing schedules and deadlines remain intact. All previously-set status dates and motion hearing dates are stricken. A reassignment status conference is set for 9/17/19 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Rowland in Courtroom 1225. The parties are directed not to notice or re-notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, prior to appearing at the reassignment status conference. For all emergency motions arising before the date of the reassignment status conference, the parties are directed to contact chambers at (312) 435-5358. To help the court learn about the case, it is hereby ordered that on or before 9/10/19, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. Courtesy copies of the status report are not required. The report shall provide the information listed in the courts "Initial Status Report for Reassigned Case," a link to which is provided on Judge Rowland's web site. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#212) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:In view of the reassignment to Judge Rowland, the status hearing of 10/16/2019 with Judge Chang is vacated. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#211) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(tg, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#210) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the fully briefed summary judgment motion #192 , the status hearing of 07/18/2019 is reset to 10/16/2019 at 9:00 AM.Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) NOTICE by David Michael Friebus of Change of Address (Friebus, David) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) RULE 56 Rule 56.1(a) Statement by Ghaliah Obaisi, Independent Executor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi regarding motion for summary judgment #192 Defendant's Response to Plantiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts (Lombardo, Joseph) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearings in 14 C 6211 and 15 C 1597 were held at the same time. With regard to 15 C 1597, counsel stated that they are waiting for Plaintiff's medical records to determine if an amended complaint will be filed. The Court will not set any deadline dates at the time in order to allow for both of Plaintiff's cases to proceed on the same track. Status hearing set for 06/23/2015 at 9:45 a.m.Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DeAndre Crawford by David Michael Friebus (Friebus, David) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DeAndre Crawford by Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer (Brechtelsbauer, Erin) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketMAILED a copy of the Order dated 4/20/2015 to the trust fund officer at Stateville Correctional Center and the Plaintiff (cc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/20/2015. Mailed notice(cc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Order, the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted and the motion for attorney representation #4 is granted. As in Case No. 14 C 06211 filed by Crawford, the Court recruits again David Michael Friebus of Baker & Hostetler LLP, 191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 3100, Chicago, IL 60601. Crawford is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $8.26. The trust fund officer at Crawford's place of incarceration is authorized and ordered to collect the partial filing fee from Crawford's trust fund account and pay it directly to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Crawford's trust fund officer is directed to collect monthly payments from Crawford's trust fund account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income credited to the account. Monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Clerk of Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the full $350 filing fee is paid. All payments shall be sent to the Clerk, United States District Court, 219 S. Dearborn St., Chicago, Illinois 60604, attn: Cashier's Desk, 20th Floor, and shall clearly identify Crawford's name and this case number. This payment obligation will follow Crawford wherever he may be transferred. On screening review, the complaint survives except for Defendant Officer Alvarez, who is misjoined and is dismissed from this case. Status hearing set for 05/07/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/20/2015. Mailed notice (cc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff DeAndre Crawford for attorney representation (jl, ) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff DeAndre Crawford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit)(jl, ) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (jl, ) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by DeAndre Crawford (Envelope postmark 02/14/2015; institution mail room) (jl, ) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKS (C) is a litigant

Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Josephine Tung

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer