This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2018 at 07:37:17 (UTC).

Crawford v. Black, et al.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 Crawford filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Black. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers and George C. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01310

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Presiding Judge

George C. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shawn R. Crawford

Hilliard, OH 43026

Shawn Randall Crawford

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Phillip Black

State of Ohio Department of Medicaid

John Does 1-4

Indian River Transport Company

John Doe Corporation 1-4

Phillip Daniel Black

Ohio Department of Medicaid

Indian River Transport Co.

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Ohio Department of Medicaid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Peter Schabo

Attorney at Mancini Smith Law Group

32 W. Hoster Street, Ste 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Robert Gregory Smith

Attorney at James E Arnold & Associates, LPA

115 West Main Street, 4Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215-3853

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Beth Anne S Lashuk

Attorney at Jurca & Lashuk, LLC

240 North Fifth Street, Suite 330

Columbus, OH 43215

Sean P Casey

Attorney at Jurca & Lashuk, LLC

240 N. Fifth St., Ste. 330

Columbus, OH 43215

Jeffrey John Jurca

Attorney at Jurca & Lashuk, LLC

240 North Fifth Street, Suite 330

Columbus, OH 43215

Robert Joseph Byrne

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General

150 E Gay Street, 21St Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Robert Joseph Byrne

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General

150 E Gay Street, 21St Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Court VACATES the Pretrial Conference scheduled for November 29, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. and ADOPTS the following schedule: This case is referred to the December, 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 2/11/2019. Motions to Amend due by 2/11/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/11/2019. Primary Expert due by 6/3/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/15/2019. Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2019. Any opposition shall be filed by 10/21/2019; any reply brief shall be filed by 11/4/2019. Settlement Demand due by 11/4/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 29, 2018. (jlk) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#9

(#9) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Phillip Daniel Black, Indian River Transport Co.. (Jurca, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Indian River Transport Co. (er) (Entered: 11/04/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Defendants Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company of Proof of Rendering Notice of Removal to the State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal) (Jurca, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company. (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Phillip Black, John Doe Corporation 1-4, John Does 1-4, Indian River Transport Company filed by Department of Medicaid. (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company. (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

2 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Shawn R. Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #7

Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Indian River Transport Co

1 #4

Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Cross-Claim

1 #3

Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Plaintiff

1 #2

Exhibit Answer and Cross-Claim of Defendant State of Ohio Department of Medicaid

1 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Franklin County, Ohio, case number 18CV09-8112, filed by Indian River Transport Company, Phillip Black. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Cross-Claim of Defendant State of Ohio Department of Medicaid, #3 Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Cross-Claim, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Indian River Transport Co.) (Jurca, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Court VACATES the Pretrial Conference scheduled for November 29, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. and ADOPTS the following schedule: This case is referred to the December, 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 2/11/2019. Motions to Amend due by 2/11/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/11/2019. Primary Expert due by 6/3/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/15/2019. Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2019. Any opposition shall be filed by 10/21/2019; any reply brief shall be filed by 11/4/2019. Settlement Demand due by 11/4/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 29, 2018. (jlk) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: The 11/29/2018 at 11:00 AM Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. (See ECF No. #9 .) (sln) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Phillip Daniel Black, Indian River Transport Co.. (Jurca, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Indian River Transport Co. (er) (Entered: 11/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Defendants Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company of Proof of Rendering Notice of Removal to the State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal) (Jurca, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company. (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Phillip Black, John Doe Corporation 1-4, John Does 1-4, Indian River Transport Company filed by Department of Medicaid. (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Black, Indian River Transport Company. (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Shawn R. Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (jlk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Franklin County, Ohio, case number 18CV09-8112, filed by Indian River Transport Company, Phillip Black. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Cross-Claim of Defendant State of Ohio Department of Medicaid, #3 Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit Answer of Defendants Black and Indian River Transport Co. to Cross-Claim, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Indian River Transport Co.) (Jurca, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-6654096 (kk) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAID is a litigant