This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 08:15:25 (UTC).

Crandell v. Hardy County Rural Development Authority

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 Crandell filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Hardy County Rural Development Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Preston Bailey, James E. Seibert and James P. Mazzone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

Referral Judges

James E. Seibert

James P. Mazzone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Osborne Crandell, III

West River, MD 20778

Defendant

Hardy County Rural Development Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Peter G. Zurbuch

Attorney at Busch, Zurbuch & Thompson, PLLC

Po Box 1819

Elkins, WV 26241

Robert C Chenoweth

Attorney at Busch, Zurbuch & Thompson, PLLC

Po Box 1819

Elkins, WV 26241

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 First Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/29/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

10 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#10

(#10) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/24/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2018. Discovery due by 11/26/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/24/18. copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail(njz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Hardy County Rural Development Authority.(Chenoweth, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hardy County Rural Development Authority. (Chenoweth, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit 11-Correspondence dated 6/25/1996

1 #10

Exhibit 10-Deed

1 #9

Exhibit 9-Certificate of Compliance and Partial Release

1 #8

Exhibit 8-Correspondence dated 3/28/17

1 #7

Exhibit 7-Deed

1 #6

Exhibit 6-Covenants and Restrictions

1 #5

Exhibit 5-photo of land

1 #4

Exhibit 4-photo of land

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Covenants and Restrictions

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Covenants and Restrictions

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Correspondence dated 8/18/1992

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hardy County Rural Development Authority filed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Correspondence dated 8/18/1992, #2 Exhibit 2-Covenants and Restrictions, #3 Exhibit 3-Covenants and Restrictions, #4 Exhibit 4-photo of land, #5 Exhibit 5-photo of land, #6 Exhibit 6-Covenants and Restrictions, #7 Exhibit 7-Deed, #8 Exhibit 8-Correspondence dated 3/28/17, #9 Exhibit 9-Certificate of Compliance and Partial Release, #10 Exhibit 10-Deed, #11 Exhibit 11-Correspondence dated 6/25/1996, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(njz) Complaint submitted at counter in Elkins point of holding court (Entered: 08/30/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 First Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/29/18. (njz) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/24/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2018. Discovery due by 11/26/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/24/18. copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail(njz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Hardy County Rural Development Authority.(Chenoweth, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hardy County Rural Development Authority. (Chenoweth, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/5/18. (njz) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hardy County Rural Development Authority served on 8/31/2018. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Envelope) (jss). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#5) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone, per Order entered 9/4/2018 in 3:18-mc-100. Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert no longer assigned to the case. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff w/MC Order via US Mail) (nmm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNE012942 (njz) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Hardy County Rural Development Authority filed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Correspondence dated 8/18/1992, #2 Exhibit 2-Covenants and Restrictions, #3 Exhibit 3-Covenants and Restrictions, #4 Exhibit 4-photo of land, #5 Exhibit 5-photo of land, #6 Exhibit 6-Covenants and Restrictions, #7 Exhibit 7-Deed, #8 Exhibit 8-Correspondence dated 3/28/17, #9 Exhibit 9-Certificate of Compliance and Partial Release, #10 Exhibit 10-Deed, #11 Exhibit 11-Correspondence dated 6/25/1996, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(njz) Complaint submitted at counter in Elkins point of holding court (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less