This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 17:09:18 (UTC).

Craine v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Craine filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00628

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Craine

Defendants

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Life Insurance Company of North America

Life Insurance Company of North America doing business as CIGNA Group Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vicki J. Bejma

Attorney at Robinson & Clapham

123 Dyer Street, Suite 135

Providence, RI 02903

Noelle K. Clapham

Attorney at Robinson & Clapham

24 Salt Pond Road, Suite A-8, 783-3600, Fax: 783-3670

South Kingstown, RI 02879

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#8

(#8) Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Michelle Craine, Life Insurance Company of North America.(Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287804 ), filed by Michelle Craine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Michelle Craine, Life Insurance Company of North America.(Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287804 ), filed by Michelle Craine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287804 ), filed by Michelle Craine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less