This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:59:58 (UTC).

CPF Vaseo Associates LLC v. Epicenter Partners LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 CPF Vaseo Associates LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Epicenter Partners LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02857

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Appellant

CPF Vaseo Associates LLC

Appellees

ROI Properties Incorporated

Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC

Epicenter Partners LLC

Bruce Gray

Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC

Gray Meyer Fannin LLC

Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC

Emerald Equities LLC

East of Epicenter LLC

Not Classified By Court

Arizona State Land Department

Barbara A Gray

Thomas Title & Escrow

7150 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 195

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Abrams Capital Partners II LP

Maricopa County Treasurer

Abrams Capital Partners I LP

Joseph E Meyer, Jr.

Abrams Capital LLC

Desert Ridge Community Association

BV Lending LLC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Todd Andrew Burgess

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Lindsi Michelle Weber

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John R Clemency

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Appellee Attorneys

Stuart B Rodgers

Attorney at Lane & Nach PC

2025 N 3Rd St, Ste 157

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Paul Michael Hilkert

Attorney at Lane & Nach PC

2025 N 3Rd St., Ste. 157

Phoenix, AZ 85004

David Jeffrey Hindman

Attorney at Mesch Clark & Rothschild PC

259 N Meyer Ave

Tucson, AZ 85741

Frederick Jay Petersen

Attorney at Mesch Clark & Rothschild PC

259 N Meyer Ave

Tucson, AZ 85701-1090

Michael William McGrath

Attorney at Mesch Clark & Rothschild PC

259 N Meyer Ave

Tucson, AZ 85701-1090

Thomas J Salerno

Attorney at Gordon Silver

1 E Washington St., Ste. 400

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John Neil Stuart

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Daniel G Dowd

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Kevin Christopher Moyer

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

E Jeffrey Walsh

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

David Dennis Cleary

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

James E Cross

Attorney at Cross Law Firm PLC

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 1150

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4172

Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Michael Walter Zimmerman

Attorney at Berry Riddell LLC

6750 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85251-2020

Other Attorneys

Dale C Schian

Attorney at Schian Walker PLC

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4531

Joseph M Vanleuven

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP - Portland, OR

1300 Sw 5Th Ave., Ste. 2400

Portland, OR 97201-5610

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing filed by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Lacey, Alisa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

14 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Appellants' Second Motion For Extension Of

#14

(#14) * Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Appellants' Second Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing)(Burgess, Todd) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 11/5/2018 (LAD). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#13

(#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Michael Hilkert. Reason for return: moved, left no address. Document number #11 . (EJA) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE from the Bankruptcy Court that the certificate that the Record on Appeal is complete cannot be filed for the reason(s) stated in the attached document. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting in part Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time #10 . Appellant's response to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss is due no later than November 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/19/2018. (LMR) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

10 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Stipulation For Temporary Rest

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Stipulation For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction)(Burgess, Todd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#9

(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Michael Hilkert. Reason for return: unable to forward. Document numbers #2 and #3 . (SLQ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC identifying Corporate Parent Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC for Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC. (Stuart, John) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Burgess, Todd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROI Properties Incorporated. (Rodgers, Stuart) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Abrams Capital LLC, Abrams Capital Management LLC, Abrams Capital Management LP, Abrams Capital Partners I LP, Abrams Capital Partners II LP, BV Lending LLC, CPF Vaseo Associates LLC, Desert Ridge Community Association, East of Epicenter LLC, Emerald Equities LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, ROI Properties Incorporated, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Swiss Desert LLC, Thomas Title & Escrow. (REK) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing filed by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Lacey, Alisa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) * Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Appellants' Second Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing)(Burgess, Todd) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 11/5/2018 (LAD). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Michael Hilkert. Reason for return: moved, left no address. Document number #11 . (EJA) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE from the Bankruptcy Court that the certificate that the Record on Appeal is complete cannot be filed for the reason(s) stated in the attached document. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting in part Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time #10 . Appellant's response to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss is due no later than November 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/19/2018. (LMR) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Stipulation For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction)(Burgess, Todd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Michael Hilkert. Reason for return: unable to forward. Document numbers #2 and #3 . (SLQ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • (#8) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simpson, Christopher) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC identifying Corporate Parent Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC for Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC. (Stuart, John) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Burgess, Todd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROI Properties Incorporated. (Rodgers, Stuart) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Abrams Capital LLC, Abrams Capital Management LLC, Abrams Capital Management LP, Abrams Capital Partners I LP, Abrams Capital Partners II LP, BV Lending LLC, CPF Vaseo Associates LLC, Desert Ridge Community Association, East of Epicenter LLC, Emerald Equities LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, ROI Properties Incorporated, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Swiss Desert LLC, Thomas Title & Escrow. (REK) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of Ninth Circuit by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (REK) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.