This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2018 at 07:50:56 (UTC).

CPC Carolina PR, LLC v. Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 CPC Carolina PR, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01555

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CPC Carolina PR, LLC

Defendants

Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jose L. Ramirez-Coll

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

Defendant Attorneys

Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz

Attorney at Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

P.O. Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina

Attorney at Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

P.O. Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Category Sheet

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

#3

3 #1

Summons

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 10/26/2018. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/11/2018. (EES) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until October 26, 2018 to File Answer /Regarding Appearance by Defendants re: #1 Complaint, filed by CPC Carolina PR, LLC filed by Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 9/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gonzalez-Diaz, Arlyn) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER #4 Motion to Restrict. "Motion allowed provisionally." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/10/2018. (EES) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Gonzalez-Diaz, Arlyn) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CPC Carolina PR, LLC upon Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Ramirez-Coll, Jose) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 of Civil Procedure and Puerto Rico Rule 7.1 filed by Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira on behalf of CPC Carolina PR, LLC Responses due by 8/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Zequeira, Salvador) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Restrict Document Exhibit I of the Complaint filed by Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira on behalf of CPC Carolina PR, LLC Responses due by 8/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Zequeira, Salvador) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Puero Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5997722.), filed by CPC Carolina PR, LLC. Service due by 11/6/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ramirez-Coll, Jose) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CPC Carolina PR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant