This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2018 at 07:57:37 (UTC).

Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc. v. Nebraska Department of Administrative Services et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nebraska Department of Administrative Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas D. Thalken and Robert F. Rossiter. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:16-CV-03094

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas D. Thalken

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc.

Defendants

Calder Lynch

Nebraska Department of Administrative Services

Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services

Courtney Phillips

Bo Botelho

Doug Peterson

Byron Diamond

Intervenor Defendant

Nebraska Total Care, Inc.

Intervenors

UnitedHealthCare of the Midlands, Inc.

Wellcare of Nebraska, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

Thomas J. Kenny

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Suzanne M. Shehan

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Robert M. Slovek

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica M. Forch

2115 State Capitol Building

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

Ryan C. Gilbride

2115 State Capitol Building

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

David A. Lopez

2115 State Capitol Building

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

Ryan S. Post

2115 State Capitol Building

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

James D. Smith

2115 State Capitol Building

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Michael C. Cox

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street Suite 800

Omaha, NE 68124

Patrice D. Ott

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street Suite 800

Omaha, NE 68124

David A. Yudelson

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street Suite 800

Omaha, NE 68124

Intervenor Attorneys

Craig C. Dirrim

301 South 13Th Street Suite 500

Lincoln, NE 68508-2578

Paul M. Schudel

301 South 13Th Street Suite 500

Lincoln, NE 68508-2578

Edward H. Tricker

301 South 13Th Street Suite 500

Lincoln, NE 68508-2578

A. Andre Hendrick

1180 West Peachtree Street, N.W. Suite 1800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Robert S. Highsmith, Jr.

1180 West Peachtree Street, N.W. Suite 1800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Patrick D. Pepper

Attorney at MCGRATH, NORTH LAW FIRM

1601 Dodge Street Suite 3700

Omaha, NE 68102-1627

Karen D. Walker

315 South Calhoun Street Suite 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Keith M. Wiener

1180 West Peachtree Street, N.W. Suite 1800

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#44

#63

#74

#78

#81

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ORDER that Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc.'s Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Filing No. 79 in Case No. 4:16CV3094 and Filing No. 73 in Case No. 4:16CV3100) is approved. AmeriHealth Nebraska, Inc.'s Notice of Dismissa l (Filing No. 80 in Case No. 4:16CV3094 and Filing No. 74 in Case No. 4:16CV3100) is approved. The above-captioned consolidated cases are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. The Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by the defend ants and intervenors (Filing Nos. 45, 51, 54, and 59 in Case No. 4:16CV3094 and Filing Nos. 37, 42, 45, and 51 in Case No. 4:16CV3100) are denied as moot. Member Cases: 4:16-cv-03094-RFR-TDT, 4:16-cv-03100-RFR-TDT. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Aetna's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 21 in case 4:16-cv-03094 is DENIED. Arbor Health's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 21 in case 4:16-cv-03100 is DENIED. Member Cases: 4:16-cv-03094-RFR-TDT, 4:16-cv-03100-RFR-TDT. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ORDER denying Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and to Present Live Testimony 66 and Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief 72 in case 4:16-cv-03094-RFR-TDT; and denying Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and to Present Live Testimony 58 and Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief 66 in case 4:16-cv-03100-RFR-TDT. Member Cases: 4:16-cv-03094-RFR-TDT, 4:16-cv-03100-RFR-TDT Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER that the defendants' Joint Motion to Consolidate (Filing No. 32 in case 4:16CV3094; Filing No. 26 in case 4:16CV3100) are granted. The two above-captioned cases are consolidated for all purposes. Case No. 4:16CV3094 is hereby designate d as the "Lead Case." Case number 4:16CV3100 is hereby designated as the "Member Case." The court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properly docketed, the documen ts filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in all Member Cases. To this end, the parties are instructed to file all further documents related to discovery (except those described in paragraph 5) in the Lead Case, No. 4:16CV3094, and to sel ect the option "yes" in response to the System's question whether to spread the text. The parties may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items related to service of process. If a party believes that an item in addition to those described in paragraph 4 should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in one or more member cases. The motion must be filed in all the consolidated cases using the spread text feature. Member Cases: 4:16-cv-03094-RFR-TDT, 4:16-cv-03100-RFR-TDT Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (LAC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER that the Motion to Continue (Filing No. 34 ) is granted. The motion hearing is continued until August 11, 2016 at 9:00 a.m.. Defendants have until July 25, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Filing No. 1-1). Defendants have until July 25, 2016 to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (LAC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Yudelson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrice D. Ott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C. Cox