This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2020 at 06:33:21 (UTC).

Cousino v. Whole Foods Market, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2017 Cousino filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Whole Foods Market, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy A. Leen and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-02531

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy A. Leen

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn Marie Cousino

Defendants

Whole Foods Market, Inc.

Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc.

Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.

WFM Southern Nevada, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David H. Krieger

Attorney at Krieger Law Group, LLC

2850 W. Horizon Ridge Blvd., Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89052

Matthew I Knepper

Attorney at Knepper & Clark, LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Miles N Clark

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Sean N. Payne

Attorney at PAYNE LAW FIRM LLC

9550 S. Eastern Ave. Suite 253-A213

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Sean N Payne

Attorney at PAYNE LAW FIRM LLC

9317 Spellman Ct.

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher R Miltenberger

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

10845 Griffith Peak Drive, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Scott C. Holbrook

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Mark E Ferrario

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

10845 Griffith Peak, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Dante A. Marinucci

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Ann Yackshaw

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

200 Civic Center Drive, Suite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Daniel R. Warren

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

John H. Hempfling, II

Attorney at Whole Foods Market Central Office

550 Bowie Street

Austin, TX 78703

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

#42

#40

39 #1

Exhibit A - Decision In Re Zappos.com, Inc.

#39

14 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Timothy Horn

14 #1

Exhibit A - Whole Foods Market Payment Card Investigation Update

#14

#9

#8

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated pursuant to #44 Notice Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice; filed by Plaintiff Lynn Marie Cousino. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER re: #42 Notice of Pending Settlement. ORDERED that the parties shall have until June 29, 2018 to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Pending Settlement by Lynn Marie Cousino. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/21/2018. Re #39 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave #39 is GRANTED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NON-OPPOSITION to #39 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Plaintiff Lynn Marie Cousino. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority re #14 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision In Re Zappos.com, Inc.) (Miltenberger, Christopher) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #36 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #35 Stipulation for ESI Discovery Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/8/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STIPULATION (Proposed) Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiff Lynn Marie Cousino. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: #4 Amended Complaint Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc. answer due 1/16/2018; WFM Southern Nevada, Inc. answer due 1/16/2018; Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. answer due 1/16/2018; Whole Foods Market, Inc. answer due 1/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Stipulation, by Defendants Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Miltenberger, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Daniel R. Warren and Scott R. Holbrook to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 2/23/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #5 Stipulation. ERROR: Stipulation is not dated. CORRECTION: Attorney Christopher R Miltenberger advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to #5 Stipulation. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #4 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Miltenberger, Christopher) Corrected Image #8 Attached on 1/10/2018 (TR). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Whole Foods Market, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc. by Lynn Marie Cousino. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 3/4/2018.(Clark, Miles) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (MMM) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lymm Lynn Marie Cousino. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4793460), filed by Lymm Lynn Marie Cousino. Proof of service due by 12/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (MMM). (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott C. Holbrook

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John H. Hempfling, II